EP3675558 - SWITCHING TRANSMISSION BASED ON DATA TRANSMISSION DELAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/27] | NETWORK SWITCHING METHOD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND CHIP SUBSYSTEM | ||
[2023/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/35] |
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Jianjian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
JADHAV, Rahul Arvind SYNO 37, 46, 45/3, 45/4 ETC., KNO 1540 Kundalahalli Village Bengaluru, Karnataka 560037 / IN | 03 /
YANG, Neng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
CAO, Zhen Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Fanzhao Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 19845360.7 | 06.04.2019 | [2020/27] | WO2019CN81638 | Priority number, date | CN201810872929 | 02.08.2018 Original published format: CN201810872929 | [2020/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020024609 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3675558 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3675558 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, H04W36/14, H04W36/30, H04W88/06, H04W76/16, H04W36/28 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
H04W76/16 (EP);
H04W36/0066 (CN,KR);
H04W84/12 (US);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04W36/00 (EP);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04W88/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04W92/02 (US);
H04W36/1446 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/27] | H04W36/00, H04W36/14, H04W36/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMSCHALTEN DER ÜBERTRAGUNG AUF DER GRUNDLAGE DER DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERZÖGERUNG | [2023/14] | English: | SWITCHING TRANSMISSION BASED ON DATA TRANSMISSION DELAY | [2023/14] | French: | COMMUTATION DE LA TRANSMISSION EN FONCTION DU DÉLAI DE TRANSMISSION DES DONNÉES | [2023/14] |
Former [2020/27] | NETZWERKVERMITTLUNGSVERFAHREN, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND CHIPUNTERSYSTEM | ||
Former [2020/27] | NETWORK SWITCHING METHOD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND CHIP SUBSYSTEM | ||
Former [2020/27] | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUTATION DE RÉSEAU, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SOUS-SYSTÈME DE PUCE | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2020 | Translation filed | 28.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 28.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013169991 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [Y]US2016043844 (MEYLAN ARNAUD [US], et al); | [XYI]US2017099338 (YANG YAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2017170164 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]); | [A]US2018077623 (SIROTKIN ALEXANDER [IL], et al); | [AP]US2019037433 (NAGASAKA YUSHI [JP], et al) | International search | [A]CN105101438 (NUBIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [X]CN105554831 (NUBIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]US2016242109 (KWAK JIN SAM [KR], et al) |