EP3829981 - AUTOMATED ITEM-LEVEL ORDER FULFILLMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dematic Corp. 507 Plymouth Avenue, NE Grand Rapids, MI 49505 / US | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHODL, Michael S. 8395 5 Mile Rd, NE Ada, Michigan 49301 / US | 02 /
PUITE, Philip J. 526 Fairfield Ave, NW Grand Rapids, Michigan 49504 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Moser Götze & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9 45127 Essen / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19845419.1 | 30.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019IB56506 | Priority number, date | US201862712684P | 31.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862712684 P | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020026148 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3829981 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/00, B65G1/137, G06Q10/08, G06Q20/20, G06Q30/06, G07G1/00, G07F9/00 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
B65G1/1373 (EP,US);
B65G1/0492 (US);
B65G1/1378 (EP,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q20/202 (EP);
G06Q30/0635 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | B65B5/06, B65B5/08, B65G1/00, B65G1/02, B65G1/04, B65G1/137 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE AUFTRAGSABWICKLUNG AUF ARTIKELEBENE | [2021/23] | English: | AUTOMATED ITEM-LEVEL ORDER FULFILLMENT | [2021/23] | French: | EXÉCUTION AUTOMATISÉE DE COMMANDE DE NIVEAU ARTICLE | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008067964 (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]US2014205423 (YAMASHITA SHIN [DE]); | [Y]JP2014141313 (JB CREATE CO LTD); | [A]WO2018006966 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]); | [Y]WO2018044851 (INTELLIGRATED HEADQUARTERS LLC [US]); | [A]WO2018058020 (INTELLIGRATED HEADQUARTERS LLC [US]) | International search | CA2923474 [xy] (DEMATIC CORP [US]) [x] 1,2,4-13,17-19 [y] 3,14-16; | US9409664 [y] (VLIET KEVIN R [US], et al) [y] 3; | US9540171 [y] (ELAZARY LIOR [US], et al)[y] 14-16,20 | by applicant | US8713899 | US2015217975 | WO2018044851 |