EP3830131 - MUSCLE TARGETING COMPLEXES AND USES THEREOF FOR TREATING FRIEDREICH'S ATAXIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyne Therapeutics, Inc. 830 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Romesh, R. 400 Technology Square, 10th Floor Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
QATANANI, Mohammed, T. 400 Technology Square, 10th Floor Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
WEEDEN, Timothy 400 Technology Square, 10th Floor Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | Miller, David James, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19845433.2 | 02.08.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019US44959 | Priority number, date | US201862714035P | 02.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862714035 P | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020028840 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830131 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, C07K16/28, A61K39/395 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/2881 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/6849 (KR,US);
A61K31/713 (KR);
A61K47/549 (US);
A61K47/6807 (KR);
A61K47/6889 (KR,US);
A61P21/00 (KR,US);
C12N15/1137 (KR);
C12Y204/02008 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
C07K2317/24 (KR,US);
C07K2317/33 (KR);
C07K2317/41 (KR);
C07K2317/55 (KR);
C07K2317/622 (KR);
C07K2317/77 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2319/50 (KR);
C12N2310/11 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/14 (KR,US);
C12N2310/314 (US);
C12N2310/315 (KR,US);
C12N2310/32 (KR);
C12N2310/321 (US);
C12N2310/322 (US);
C12N2310/3233 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, C12N15/113 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Extension states | BA | 01.03.2021 | ME | 01.03.2021 | Validation states | MD | 01.03.2021 | Title | German: | AUF MUSKEL ABZIELENDE KOMPLEXE UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER FRIEDREICHSCHEN ATAXIE | [2021/23] | English: | MUSCLE TARGETING COMPLEXES AND USES THEREOF FOR TREATING FRIEDREICH'S ATAXIA | [2021/23] | French: | COMPLEXES DE CIBLAGE MUSCULAIRE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ATAXIE DE FRIEDREICH | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 08.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 03.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 03.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 03.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2015023939 (RANA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2016081643 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2016094374 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2017221883 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS CO [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [P]EP3473270 (GENAHEAD BIO INC [JP]); | [E]WO2020028857 (DYNE THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [E] 1-14* the whole document *; | [YD] - LI LIANDE ET AL, "Activation of Frataxin Protein Expression by Antisense Oligonucleotides Targeting the Mutant Expanded Repeat", NUCLEIC ACID THERAPEUTICS, US, vol. 28, no. 1, doi:10.1089/nat.2017.0703, ISSN 2159-3337, (20180201), pages 23 - 33, URL: https://www.liebertpub.com/doi/pdf/10.1089/nat.2017.0703, XP055933651 [YD] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/nat.2017.0703 | [A] - SHEN XIULONG ET AL, "Activating frataxin expression by single-stranded siRNAs targeting the GAA repeat expansion", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20180721), vol. 28, no. 17, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2018.07.033, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2850 - 2855, XP085447081 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2018.07.033 | International search | [Y]US2016201064 (OZSOLAK FATIH [US]) [Y] 1-5 * . Especially para [0132], claim 1. *; | [Y]US2018134797 (ZHANG YIN [US], et al) [Y] 4-5* . Especially para [0151], SEQ ID NO: 1 *; | [Y] - SCHNYDER et al., "Targeting of skeletal muscle in vitro using biotinylated immunoliposomes", Biochem J, (20040101), vol. 377, pages 61 - 67, XP002560984 [Y] 1-5 * . Especially abstract, pg 61 col 1 para 1, pg 62 col 1 para 1, pg 65 col 1 para 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BJ20031034 |