EP3899497 - LASER DEVICE FOR POLARIZATION INTERFEROMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université de Technologie de Troyes 12, rue Marie Curie 10000 Troyes / FR | For all designated states Phaselab Instrument 2 rue Gustave Eiffel 10430 Rosières-Prés-Troyes / FR | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAILLANT, Julien 19 rue Rouget de Lisle 10300 SAINTE-SAVINE / FR | 02 /
BRUYANT, Aurélien 7 rue André Massin 10120 SAINT-ANDRE-LES-VERGERS / FR | 03 /
WU, Tzu-Heng N° 19, Lane 108 Section 3 Lang-Feng Road YI-LAN CITY, 26059 / TW | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19845705.3 | 17.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019FR53109 | Priority number, date | FR20180073212 | 18.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1873212 | [2021/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020128293 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3899497 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3899497 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/21, G01N21/39, H01S5/062, H01S5/0687, H01S5/183, H01S5/00, H01S5/0683 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
G01N21/211 (EP,US);
G01N21/554 (US);
H01S5/005 (EP,US);
H01S5/06213 (EP);
H01S5/06246 (EP);
H01S5/06832 (EP);
G01N2021/399 (EP);
G01N2201/0612 (EP,US);
G01N2201/0683 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | G01N21/21, H01S5/183, H01S5/062, G01B9/02, H01S5/0687, G01N21/39, G01J3/433 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASERVORRICHTUNG ZUR POLARISATIONSINTERFEROMETRIE | [2021/43] | English: | LASER DEVICE FOR POLARIZATION INTERFEROMETRY | [2021/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF LASER POUR INTERFEROMETRIE A POLARISATION | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 02.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | LU | 17.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SI | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5305330 (RIEDER HEINZ [AT], et al) [Y] 6,7 * column 1, line 9 - line 37 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 8 * * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 52; figures 1,3 * * claims 1,13 *; | [Y]US5374991 (ATKINSON LELAND G [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * column 9, line 12 - line 56; figure 2 *; | [XY]US7233396 (HALL JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 6, line 7 - column 7, line 19; figure 2 * * claims 1,3 * [Y] 6-13; | [Y] - Aurélien Bruyant ET AL, "Interferometry Using Generalized Lock-in Amplifier (G-LIA): A Versatile Approach for Phase-Sensitive Sensing and Imaging", Optical Interferometry, InTech, (20170215), pages 211 - 210, doi:10.5772/66657, ISBN 978-953-51-2956-1, XP055635442 [Y] 8,9,13 * paragraph [003.] - paragraph [004.] * * figures 4-6,9-11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5772/66657 | [Y] - WATKINS L R, "Novel interferometric ellipsometer with wavelength swept source", LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS, 2004. (CLEO). CONFERENCE ON SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA MAY 20-21, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040517), vol. 1, ISBN 978-1-55752-777-6, pages 1043 - 1045, XP010745760 [Y] 10-12 * paragraph [001.] - paragraph [003.]; figure 1; tables 1,2 * | by applicant | FR2685962 | US5485271 | US7233396 | US7339681 | EP1893977 | WO2009080998 | US8004676 | US9518869 | WO2017153378 | - VAILLANT et al., "An unbalanced interferometer insensitive to wavelength drift", Sensors and Actuators A: Physical, (20170000), vol. 268, pages 188 - 192 | - AI MOHTAR, ABEER et al., "Generalized lock-in détection for interferometry: application to phase sensitive spectroscopy and near-field nanoscopy", Optics express, (20140000), vol. 22.18, pages 22232 - 22245 | - VAILLANT et al., "An unbalanced interferometer insensitive to wavelength drift", Sensors and Actuators A: Physical, vol. 268, pages 188 - 192 |