12.07.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
08.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.07.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.03.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.01.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.10.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.10.2023 |
First examination report |
|
30.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2022 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
25.02.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
25.02.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
24.01.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
24.09.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
30.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.06.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
11.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
11.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|