Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022056273 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019FR53133 | 17.12.2019 | FR1873124 | 18.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3898805 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2024 | B1 | EP3898805 | 27.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019FR53133 | 17.12.2019 | FR1873124 | 18.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020128313 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1873124 | 18.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3089986 | 15.07.2022 | B1 | FR3089986 | 19.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1873124 | 18.12.2018 |