EP3830616 - HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY (HMD) WITH SPATIALLY-VARYING RETARDER OPTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valve Corporation 10400 NE 4th Street Suite 1400 Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | [2021/40] |
Former [2021/23] | For all designated states Valve Corporation 10400 NE 4th Street Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUDMAN, Joshua Mark 10400 NE 4th Street Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19845958.8 | 09.08.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019US45988 | Priority number, date | US201816101333 | 10.08.2018 Original published format: US201816101333 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020033882 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830616 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, G02B27/01 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
G02F1/13363 (EP);
G02B27/0172 (EP,KR,US);
H04N13/332 (KR,US);
G02B27/0018 (EP,KR);
G02B27/0955 (KR,US);
G02B27/14 (KR,US);
G02B27/283 (EP,KR);
G02B5/3025 (KR,US);
G02B5/3083 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1334 (US);
G02B2027/012 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133562 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | AM KOPF MONTIERTE ANZEIGE (HMD) MIT RÄUMLICH VARIIERENDER RETARDEROPTIK | [2021/23] | English: | HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY (HMD) WITH SPATIALLY-VARYING RETARDER OPTICS | [2021/23] | French: | VISIOCASQUE (HMD) COMPRENANT UNE OPTIQUE À RETARDATEUR VARIANT DANS L'ESPACE | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 13.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2018039052 (KHAN SAJJAD A [US], et al); | [XYI]US2018101020 (GOLLIER JACQUES [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5966242 (YAMANAKA ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * : abstract, col. 11 In 14-63, col. 12 In 3-18, col. 12 In 40-44, col. 13 In 57-65, col. 14 In 58-64 *; | [A]US2010002154 (HUA HONG [US]) [A] 1-20 * : see entire document *; | [A]US2012154920 (HARRISON GREGORY A [US], et al) [A] 1-20* : see entire document *; | [A]US2015235431 (SCHOWENGERDT BRIAN T [US]) [A] 1-20 * : see entire document *; | [A]US2016231566 (LEVOLA TAPANI [FI], et al) [A] 1-20 * : see entire document *; | [A]US2017293147 (TREMBLAY ERIC [CH], et al) [A] 1-20 * : see entire document *; | [A]US2017336641 (VON UND ZU LIECHTENSTEIN MAXIMILIAN RALPH PETER [CH]) [A] 1-20 * : abstract, [0056], [0058], [0068], [0071], [0072], [0085] *; | [A]WO2017213911 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-20 * : abstract 0068 * | by applicant | US2018039052 | US2018101020 |