EP3822051 - CABLE GUIDE DEVICE OF ARTICULATED ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOO, Heejong 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
ROH, Kyungshik 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Cheolhee 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
YANG, Soosang 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
JUNG, Sangjun 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 19846193.1 | 27.06.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019KR07782 | Priority number, date | KR20180091210 | 06.08.2018 Original published format: KR 20180091210 | [2021/20] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020032390 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822051 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B25J19/00 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
B25J19/0029 (EP);
B25J19/0025 (US);
H02G3/0456 (US);
H02G11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | KABELFÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINES GELENKROBOTERS | [2021/20] | English: | CABLE GUIDE DEVICE OF ARTICULATED ROBOT | [2021/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE DE CÂBLE DE ROBOT ARTICULÉ | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2021 | Translation filed | 10.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 03.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60197390 (TOKICO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0025990 (ABB AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US6431018 (OKADA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2011154933 (LIU JUN [CN], et al) [Y] 5,9,10,13,15 * fig.sign. 31,40,2113;; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]KR20120029333 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [Y] 2-4,6-8 * fig.sign. 50,55;; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]WO2016035165 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]) [Y] 12 * figures 3-5 *; | [XY]JP2017064807 (DENSO WAVE INC) [X] 1,11,14 * fig.sign. 10-16,25,31,32,40,50 M1-M6;; figures 1-9 * [Y] 2-10,12,13,15 | International search | [A]JPH05245789 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-15* [0009]-[0011] *; | [A]JPH07124886 (FANUC LTD) [A] 1-15 * ^ [0008], [0009] *; | [A]JP2559807B (FANUC LTD.) [A] 1-15; | [Y]KR100239148B (LG IND SYSTEMS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 9-10, 12; | [XY]JP2003225883 (DENSO WAVE INC) [X] 1-8, 11, 13-15 * ^ [0011]-[0031] * [Y] 9-10, 12 |