EP3830632 - PREDICTION AND THROTTLING ADJUSTMENTS BASED ON APPLICATION RENDERING PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valve Corporation 10400 NE 4th Street Suite 1400 Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | [2021/40] |
Former [2021/23] | For all designated states Valve Corporation 10400 NE 4th Street Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEIBY, Aaron 10400 NE 4th Street Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | 02 /
VLACHOS, Alex 10400 NE 4th Street Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19846361.4 | 06.08.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019US45290 | Priority number, date | US201816056277 | 06.08.2018 Original published format: US201816056277 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020033396 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830632 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/147 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP);
G02B27/0172 (KR,US);
G06T15/205 (KR,US);
G02B27/0093 (KR,US);
G06F3/012 (EP,KR);
G06F3/147 (EP);
G06T19/006 (KR,US);
G02B2027/014 (KR,US);
G09G2340/0435 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | G02B27/01, G02B27/02, G06F3/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | VORHERSAGE UND DROSSELUNG VON EINSTELLUNGEN BASIEREND AUF DER ANWENDUNGSDARSTELLUNGSLEISTUNG | [2021/23] | English: | PREDICTION AND THROTTLING ADJUSTMENTS BASED ON APPLICATION RENDERING PERFORMANCE | [2021/23] | French: | RÉGLAGES DE PRÉDICTION ET DE RALENTISSEMENT BASÉS SUR DES PERFORMANCES DE RENDU D'APPLICATION | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 29.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014268356 (BOLAS MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2017003769 (ARIADNE'S THREAD (USA) INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0055]; figures 5,6 *; | [XAI]US2017155885 (SELSTAD JOHNATHON [US], et al) [X] 1,3,10,12 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0072]; figure 2 * [A] 2,4-9,11,13,14 [I] 15 | International search | [A]US2014267420 (SCHOWENGERDT BRIAN T [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; the entire document *; | [A]US2016027141 (PATEL NIRAV [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; the entire document *; | [A]US9690099 (BAR-ZEEV AVI [US], et al) [A] 1-20* ; the entire document * | by applicant | US2017155885 |