EP3835418 - NOVEL CRISPR-ASSOCIATED PROTEIN AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G+Flas Life Sciences 1F, 38 Nakseongdae-ro Gwanak-gu Seoul 08790 / KR | For all designated states Seoul National University R & DB Foundation 1, Gwanak-ro Gwanak-Gu Seoul 08826 / KR | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOE, Sunghwa 1F, 38, Nakseongdae-ro, Gwanak-gu Seoul 08790 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Han Seong 1, Gwanak-ro, Gwanak-gu Seoul 08826 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Dong Wook 1, Gwanak-ro, Gwanak-gu Seoul 08826 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Jongjin 1F, 38, Nakseongdae-ro, Gwanak-gu Seoul 08790 / KR | 05 /
YOON, Jiyoung 1F, 38, Nakseongdae-ro, Gwanak-gu Seoul 08790 / KR | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/24] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19846625.2 | 09.08.2019 | [2021/24] | WO2019KR10110 | Priority number, date | KR20180093336 | 09.08.2018 Original published format: KR 20180093336 | [2021/24] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020032711 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3835418 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/22, C12N15/52, A61K48/00, A61P35/00, A61K38/00 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K38/00 (IL,KR);
C12N9/22 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7088 (US);
A61K31/7105 (EP);
A61K38/465 (US);
A61K48/00 (IL,KR);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12N15/52 (IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES CRISPR-ASSOZIIERTES PROTEIN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/24] | English: | NOVEL CRISPR-ASSOCIATED PROTEIN AND USE THEREOF | [2021/24] | French: | NOUVELLE PROTÉINE ASSOCIÉE AUX CRISPR ET UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI | [2021/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2021 | Translation filed | 08.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 07.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2016205711 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al); | [I]WO2017096328 (CARIBOU BIOSCIENCES INC [US]); | [I]US2017233756 (BEGEMANN MATTHEW [US], et al); | [IA]WO2017184786 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al); | [I]WO2018071672 (UNIV COLORADO REGENTS [US], et al); | International search | [XY]WO2017017016 (FROST HABIB [DK]); | [A]WO2017083722 (GREENBERG KENNETH P [US], et al); | [A]KR20170068400 (INST BASIC SCIENCE [KR]); | [A]KR20180018466 (TOOLGEN INC [KR]) |