EP3833677 - IMPROVED RSV PASSIVE AND ACTIVE VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trellis Bioscience, Inc. 702 Marshall Street, Suite 614 Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2022/03] |
Former [2021/24] | For all designated states Trellis Bioscience, LLC 702 Marshall Street Suite 614 Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDMAN, Milton J. 2626 Santa Clara Avenue Alameda, California 94501 / US | 02 /
KAUVAR, Lawrence M. 1438 Green Street, 7A San Francisco, California 94109 / US | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Hutter, Anton, et al Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 19847266.4 | 08.08.2019 | [2021/24] | WO2019US45775 | Priority number, date | US201862716184P | 08.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862716184 P | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020033742 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3833677 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/10, C07K14/005, A61K39/395 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
C07K16/1027 (EP);
A61K39/12 (US);
A61K39/395 (EP);
A61P31/14 (US);
C07K14/005 (EP);
A61K2039/545 (US);
A61K2039/6056 (US);
C07K2317/55 (EP);
C07K2317/622 (EP);
C07K2317/76 (EP);
C07K2317/92 (EP);
C12N2760/18522 (EP);
C12N2760/18534 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/24] | C07K14/135, C07K16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE RSV-PASSIVE UND -AKTIVE IMPFSTOFFE | [2021/24] | English: | IMPROVED RSV PASSIVE AND ACTIVE VACCINES | [2021/24] | French: | VACCINS PASSIFS ET ACTIFS AMÉLIORÉS CONTRE LE RSV | [2021/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 16.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 26.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 26.01.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 26.01.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2009055711 (TRELLIS BIOSCIENCE INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * throughout, in particular [0012]-[0015], examples 6-8, claims 1-5; [0044] *; | [I]US2016145322 (WADIA JEHANGIR [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * throughout, e.g. [0008]-[0013] *; | [XI] - STANISLAV O. FEDECHKIN ET AL, "Structures of respiratory syncytial virus G antigen bound to broadly neutralizing antibodies", SCIENCE IMMUNOLOGY, (20180309), vol. 14, no. 21, doi:10.1126/sciimmunol.aar3534, page 1, XP055683672 [X] 1-4 * Throughout, e.g. Introduction, pg. 5, Fig. 1 * [I] 5-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/sciimmunol.aar3534 | [I] - LEE YU-NA ET AL, "Recombinant influenza virus carrying the conserved domain of respiratory syncytial virus (RSV) G protein confers protection against RSV without inflammatory disease", VIROLOGY, (20141230), vol. 476, doi:10.1016/J.VIROL.2014.12.004, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 217 - 225, XP029196545 [I] 1-15 * throughout, e.g. abstract, Results * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2014.12.004 | [I] - YOUNGJOO CHOI ET AL, "Antibodies to the Central Conserved Region of Respiratory Syncytial Virus (RSV) G Protein Block RSV G Protein CX3C-CX3CR1 Binding and Cross-Neutralize RSV A and B Strains", VIRAL IMMUNOLOGY, (20120502), doi:10.1089/vim.2011.0094, ISSN 0882-8245, XP055102546 [I] 1-15 * throughout, e.g. abstract, Pg. 194 right col., 197, 198 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/vim.2011.0094 | [I] - SIMARD C ET AL, "EVIDENCE THAT THE AMINO ACID REGION 124-203 OF GLYCOPROTEIN G FROM THE RESPIRATORY SYNCYTIAL VIRUS (RSV) CONSTITUES A MAJOR PART OF THE POLYPEPTIDE DOMAIN THAT IS INVOLVED IN THE PROTECTION AGAINST RSV INFECTION", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (19950101), vol. 28, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0166-3542(95)00053-4, ISSN 0166-3542, pages 303 - 315, XP000565377 [I] 1-15 * throoughout, e.g. abstract, Results * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0166-3542(95)00053-4 | International search | [XY]US6077511 (LANGEDIJK JOHANNES PETRUS MARI [NL]) [X] 13 * entire document * [Y] 14, 15; | [A]US2004096451 (YOUNG JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1-11, 13-15* entire document *; | [Y]US2013034564 (KAUVAR LAWRENCE M [US], et al) [Y] 4, 15 * entire document *; | [A]US2013136759 (ANDERSON LARRY J [US], et al) [A] 1-11, 13-15 * entire document *; | [XY]US2017121394 (VORA KALPIT A [US], et al) [X] 7-11 * entire document * [Y] 5, 6, 14; | [XY] - FEDECHKIN et al., "Structures of Respiratory Syncytial Virus G Antigen Bound to Broadly-Neutralizing Antibodies", Science Immunology, (20180309), vol. 3, no. 21, pages 1 - 14, XP055683672 [X] 1-3 * . entire document * [Y] 4-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/sciimmunol.aar3534 |