EP3835823 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM, INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, AND MOVING BODY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Semiconductor Solutions Corporation 4-14-1, Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIKI, Hiroshi c/o Sony Semiconductor Solutions Corporation 4-14-1 Asahi-cho Atugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 19847375.3 | 23.07.2019 | [2021/24] | WO2019JP28923 | Priority number, date | JP20180150476 | 09.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018150476 | [2021/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020031689 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3835823 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3835823 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/34, G01S13/87, G01S13/93, G01S13/86, G01S13/931, G01S17/931, G01S7/10, G01S7/41 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
G01S13/931 (EP,KR,US);
G01S13/34 (EP,KR);
G01S13/86 (US);
G01S13/865 (EP);
G01S13/867 (EP);
G01S13/87 (KR);
G01S7/10 (EP);
G01S7/4056 (US);
G01S7/41 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/24] | G01S13/34, G01S13/87, G01S13/93 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAMM, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG MIT SICH BEWEGENDEM KÖRPER | [2021/24] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM, INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, AND MOVING BODY DEVICE | [2021/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE, SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET DISPOSITIF DE CORPS MOBILE | [2021/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2021 | Translation filed | 02.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 01.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.01.2024 | BG | 31.01.2024 | ES | 31.01.2024 | FI | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | LT | 31.01.2024 | LV | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | SE | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | PT | 31.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
LV | 31.01.2024 | ||
PL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
PT | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 31.01.2024 | |
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 31.01.2024 | |
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010007476 (KLOTZ ALBRECHT [DE], et al); | [Y]US2010253593 (SEDER THOMAS A [US], et al); | [Y]WO2016003474 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2018095173 (KURONO YASUHIRO [JP]) | International search | [Y]JPH04315080 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [Y]JP2004191131 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JP2008509413 ; | [Y]JP2009058316 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [A]JP2009181315 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2013195245 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [Y]JP2014169922 (DENSO CORP); | [XY]JP2018115936 (DENSO TEN LTD); | [PX]WO2019008640 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [PX]JP2019066284 (DENSO TEN LTD) | by applicant | JP2016003873 |