EP3836067 - DATA STRUCTURE, STORAGE MEDIUM, STORAGE DEVICE, AND RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 28-8 Honkomagome 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0021 / JP | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATATA, Keiji c/o PIONEER CORPORATION, Kawagoe Plant, 25-1, Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-8555 / JP | 02 /
KODA, Takeshi c/o PIONEER CORPORATION, Kawagoe Plant, 25-1, Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-8555 / JP | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 19847380.3 | 31.07.2019 | [2021/24] | WO2019JP30001 | Priority number, date | JP20180151559 | 10.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018151559 | [2021/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020031806 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3836067 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/10, G06F12/14, G06F21/60, G06F21/62 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
G06F21/6209 (EP);
G06Q40/08 (EP,US);
G06F21/606 (EP);
G06F21/78 (US);
G07C5/008 (US);
G07C5/0841 (US);
G06F12/1441 (EP);
G06F2221/2111 (EP);
G06F2221/2141 (EP);
G06F2221/2143 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/24] | G06Q50/10, G08G1/00, G08G1/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Title | German: | DATENSTRUKTUR, SPEICHERMEDIUM, SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG UND EMPFÄNGER | [2021/24] | English: | DATA STRUCTURE, STORAGE MEDIUM, STORAGE DEVICE, AND RECEIVER | [2021/24] | French: | STRUCTURE DE DONNÉES, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE, DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE ET RÉCEPTEUR | [2021/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2021 | Translation filed | 01.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 01.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/15] | 22.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/15] | Divisional application(s) | EP22204082.6 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2003005639 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [X]WO2006006678 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2006197156 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [X]JP2007249951 (OKI DATA KK); | [A]US2014181033 (PAWAR RAHUL S [US], et al); | [A]JP2015088802 (IWAI YASUAKI); | [A]JP2018055191 (HITACHI LTD) | International search | [XY]JP2007249951 (OKI DATA KK); | [Y]JP2009134551 (SKY KK); | [A]JP2016111646 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2018055191 (HITACHI LTD) | by applicant | JP2016156973 |