EP3835492 - REMOTELY OPERATED SHOVEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/24] | SHOVEL | ||
[2022/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo (S.H.I.) Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 1-1 Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6025 / JP | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHI, Takashi c/o SUMITOMO(S.H.I.) CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO. LTD., 731-1, Naganumahara-cho, Inage-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 263-0001 / JP | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 19847859.6 | 09.08.2019 | [2021/24] | WO2019JP31706 | Priority number, date | JP20180151853 | 10.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018151853 | [2021/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020032267 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3835492 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3835492 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/20, E02F9/26, G06T7/20, B66C13/40, G06F3/01, G06K9/00, E02F9/22, G06V20/52, G06V40/10, G06V40/20 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
E02F9/20 (KR);
E02F9/205 (EP,US);
E02F9/2004 (US);
E02F9/2228 (EP);
E02F9/2235 (EP,US);
E02F9/2246 (US);
E02F9/2282 (EP);
E02F9/2285 (EP,US);
E02F9/2292 (EP,US);
E02F9/26 (KR);
E02F9/262 (EP,US);
E02F9/264 (EP);
F15B15/20 (US);
G06T7/20 (KR);
G06V20/52 (EP);
G06V40/113 (EP);
G06V40/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | E02F9/20, E02F9/26, G06T7/20, B66C13/40, G06F3/01, G06K9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2021/24] | E02F9/20, E02F9/26, G06T7/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERNGESTEURTER BAGGER | [2022/42] | English: | REMOTELY OPERATED SHOVEL | [2022/42] | French: | PELLETEUSE COMMANDÉ À DISTANCE | [2022/42] |
Former [2021/24] | SCHAUFEL | ||
Former [2021/24] | SHOVEL | ||
Former [2021/24] | PELLE | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2021 | Translation filed | 11.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | ES | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | NL | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | IE | 09.08.2023 | LU | 09.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | FR | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
IE | 09.08.2023 | ||
LU | 09.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
FR | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
IE | 09.08.2023 | ||
LU | 09.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
LU | 09.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
LU | 09.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012283896 (PERSAUD ANTHONY G [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0031] *; | [Y]US2017089033 (MATSUYAMA TORU [JP], et al) [Y] 11,12 * paragraphs [0038] , [0058]; figure 4 *; | [A]WO2017058553 (AGCO CORP [US]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0048] , [0055] - [0065]; figure 8 *; | [XY]US2018101235 (BODENSTEINER ZACHARY [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0020] , [0023] , [0051] , [0061]; figures 1,4 * [Y] 11,12 | International search | [Y]WO2016035898 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 11-12* , paragraphs [0137]-[0138] & US 2017/0089033 A1, paragraphs [0156]-[0157] & CN 105518222 A & KR 10-2017-0037807 A *; | [XYA]US2018101235 (BODENSTEINER ZACHARY [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 7-8 * , paragraphs [0018]-[0069], fig. 1-13 & EP 3306442 A1 * [Y] 11-12 [A] 4-6, 9-10 | by applicant | JP2017214761 | JP2018151853 |