EP3770295 - MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR HOT STAMPING COMPONENT HAVING ALUMINIUM-SILICON ALLOY COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/04] | MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR HOT STAMPING COMPONENT HAVING ALUMINIUM-SILICON ALLOY COATING, AND HOT STAMPING COMPONENT | ||
[2022/41] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL CO., LTD. No.885 Fujin Road Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAN, Ning No.885 Fujin Road Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | 02 /
FU, Jiang No.885 Fujin Road Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | 03 /
HONG, Jiyao No.885 Fujin Road Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | 04 /
FANG, Xuehua No.885 Fujin Road Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | [2022/46] |
Former [2021/04] | 01 /
TAN, Ning 885 Fujin Road, Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | ||
02 /
FU, Jiang 885 Fujin Road, Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | |||
03 /
HONG, Jiyao 885 Fujin Road, Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | |||
04 /
FANG, Xuehua 885 Fujin Road, Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/33] |
Former [2021/04] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19847997.4 | 06.09.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019CN104708 | Priority number, date | CN201810896744 | 08.08.2018 Original published format: CN201810896744 | CN20181135118 | 06.09.2018 Original published format: CN201811035118 | [2021/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020030200 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3770295 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3770295 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/12, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/28, C22C38/32, C21D1/18, C21D1/673, C21D1/76, C21D6/00, C21D7/13, C21D9/48, C22C38/38, C23C2/28, C23C28/02, B21D22/02 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
C23C2/12 (EP,RU,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C21D9/0081 (CN);
B21D22/022 (EP,US);
B21D22/02 (CN);
B21D37/16 (CN);
C21D1/18 (EP);
C21D1/673 (EP);
C21D1/76 (EP);
C21D11/00 (CN);
C21D6/005 (EP);
C21D7/13 (EP);
C21D9/46 (US);
C21D9/48 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C22C38/32 (EP,RU,US);
C22C38/38 (EP,RU);
C23C2/28 (EP,RU,US);
C23C2/40 (RU,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | C23C2/12, C23C2/40, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/28, C22C38/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HEISSPRÄGE-BAUTEILS MIT ALUMINIUM-SILIZIUM-LEGIERUNGSBESCHICHTUNG | [2023/13] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR HOT STAMPING COMPONENT HAVING ALUMINIUM-SILICON ALLOY COATING | [2022/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT D'ESTAMPAGE Á CHAUD AYANT UN REVÊTEMENT EN ALLIAGE ALUMINIUM-SILICIUM | [2023/13] |
Former [2021/04] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HEISSPRÄGEKOMPONENTE MIT ALUMINIUM-SILIZIUM-LEGIERUNGSBESCHICHTUNG UND HEISSPRÄGEKOMPONENTE | ||
Former [2021/04] | MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR HOT STAMPING COMPONENT HAVING ALUMINIUM-SILICON ALLOY COATING, AND HOT STAMPING COMPONENT | ||
Former [2021/04] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT D'ESTAMPAGE À CHAUD DOTÉ D'UN REVÊTEMENT EN ALLIAGE ALUMINIUM-SILICIUM, ET ÉLÉMENT D'ESTAMPAGE À CHAUD | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2020 | Translation filed | 16.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 01.12.2020 | Observations by third parties | 23.02.2021 | Observations by third parties | 18.03.2021 | Observations by third parties | 19.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2022 | Observations by third parties | 21.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.05.2024
16.05.2024
ADMISSIBLE ArcelorMittal Property - Immeuble Le Cézanne 6, rue André Campra 93210 La Plaine Saint Denis / FR Opponent's representative Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | 02
15.05.2024
16.05.2024
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/25] | 03.06.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 20.10.2020 | Date of receipt | 11.01.2021 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | IE | 06.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | FR | 16.10.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | EE | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
IE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FR | 16.10.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | EE | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
IE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | EE | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | EE | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2011056594 (MACHEREY FRIEDHELM [DE], et al); | [X]EP3070187 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]); | [Y]CN106466697 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL); | Opposition | EP1642991 | WO2008053273 | US2011056594 | CN106466697 | US6815087 |