EP3796702 - METHODS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SIGNALS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND DEVICES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/12] | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SIGNALS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND DEVICE THEREFOR | ||
[2022/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2022/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Changhwan IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-Gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
YANG, Suckchel IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-Gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
AHN, Joonkui IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-Gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Seonwook IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-Gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 05 /
HWANG, Seunggye IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-Gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 19848301.8 | 09.08.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019KR10169 | Priority number, date | KR20180093416 | 09.08.2018 Original published format: KR 20180093416 | KR20180114490 | 21.09.2018 Original published format: KR 20180114490 | KR20180114554 | 25.09.2018 Original published format: KR 20180114554 | KR20180115383 | 27.09.2018 Original published format: KR 20180115383 | KR20180134002 | 02.11.2018 Original published format: KR 20180134002 | KR20190017870 | 15.02.2019 Original published format: KR 20190017870 | [2021/12] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020032750 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3796702 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3796702 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04W24/10, // H04W72/04, H04W88/02, H04B17/309, H04L1/00, H04W56/00, H04L5/00 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
H04B17/309 (EP);
H04L5/0057 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04L1/189 (EP);
H04L1/203 (EP);
H04L67/12 (US);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04L1/0011 (EP);
H04L1/0027 (EP);
H04L1/0034 (EP);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04W24/10 (EP);
H04W4/70 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | H04W24/10, H04W74/00, H04W74/08, H04W56/00, H04B17/309, H04L1/00, H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON SIGNALEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNGEN DAFÜR | [2022/24] | English: | METHODS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SIGNALS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND DEVICES THEREFOR | [2022/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'ÉMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAUX DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET DISPOSITIFS ASSOCIÉS | [2022/24] |
Former [2021/12] | VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON SIGNALEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | ||
Former [2021/12] | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SIGNALS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND DEVICE THEREFOR | ||
Former [2021/12] | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAUX DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2020 | Translation filed | 17.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 28.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2022 | AT | 02.11.2022 | CZ | 02.11.2022 | DK | 02.11.2022 | EE | 02.11.2022 | ES | 02.11.2022 | FI | 02.11.2022 | HR | 02.11.2022 | IT | 02.11.2022 | LT | 02.11.2022 | LV | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | NL | 02.11.2022 | PL | 02.11.2022 | RO | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SE | 02.11.2022 | SI | 02.11.2022 | SK | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | NO | 02.02.2023 | GR | 03.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | PT | 02.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/16] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 02.11.2022 | |
NO | 02.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Considerations for DL quality reporting in msg3 for NB-IoT", vol. RAN WG1, no. Sanya, China; 20180416 - 20180420, (20180415), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1804897 CONSIDERATIONS FOR DL QUALITY REPORTING IN MSG3 FOR NB-IOT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPO, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20180415), XP051427160 [X] 1,6,11-14 * 1 Background * * 3 Definition on reference resource and measurement resource * * 6 Considerations on L3 filtering * * 7 Summary of proposals * [I] 1-14 | [XI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Introduction of DL channel quality reporting in MSG3", vol. RAN WG2, no. Busan, Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180520), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1807869 DL CHANNEL QUALITY REPORTING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20180520), XP051444202 [X] 1,6,11-14 * 1 Introduction * * 2.2 Measurement reporting * * Proposals 1, 4 * [I] 1-14 | [XI] - ERICSSON, "NB-IoT downlink channel quality determination and report", vol. RAN WG4, no. Busan, Korea (Republic of); 20180521 - 20180525, (20180520), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-1806754 ENB NPDCCH QUALITY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN4/Docs/, (20180520), XP051446402 [X] 1,6,11-14 * 1 Introduction * * 2.1 New random access procedure in NB-IoT * * figure 1 * * 2.2 NPDCCH repetition number with BLER of 1% * [I] 1-14 | International search | [A]WO2017136004 (INTEL IP CORP [US])[A] 1-15; | [YA] - Schlienz J; Raddino D, "Narrowband Internet of Things Whitepaper NarrowBand_IoT ─ 1MA266_0e", (20160808), pages 1 - 42, rohde-schwarz, URL: https://cdn.rohde-schwarz.com/pws/dl_downloads/dl_application/application_notes/1ma266/1MA266_0e_NB_IoT.pdf, XP055448951 [Y] 1-2, 5-9, 12-15 [A] 3-4, 10-11 | [Y] - "3GPP TS 36.213 version 13.10.0 Release 13", 3GPP TS 36.213, (20180708), no. V13.10.0, pages 363 - 381, XP055765110 [Y] 1-2, 5-9, 12-15 | [A] - LG Electronics, "MIB-NB skipping and System information acquisition latency enhancement", 3GPP Draft; R1-1719882, Reno, USA, (20171118), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 16, XP051369595 [A] 1-15 | [A] - WI rapporteur (Ericsson), "RANI agreements for Rel-13 NB-IoT", 3GPP Draft; R1-165977, Nanjing, China, (20160811), pages 1 - 33, XP051141850 [A] 1-15 |