EP3840244 - SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD, BEAM DETERMINATION METHOD AND APPARATUSES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. No. 29 Xueyuan Road Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states Datang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. No. 29, Xueyuan Road Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Qiuping No. 40 Xueyuan Rd., Haidian District Beijing 100191 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Runhua No. 40 Xueyuan Rd., Haidian District Beijing 100191 / CN | 03 /
GAO, Qiubin No. 40 Xueyuan Rd., Haidian District Beijing 100191 / CN | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 19849357.9 | 13.08.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019CN100449 | Priority number, date | CN201810942908 | 17.08.2018 Original published format: CN201810942908 | [2021/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020034969 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3840244 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04W72/04, H04B7/08 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04B7/0617 (CN);
H04W72/046 (CN,US);
H04B7/0408 (US);
H04B7/088 (EP);
H04W72/21 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/25] | H04B7/06, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, STRAHLENBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN UND GERÄTE DAFÜR | [2021/25] | English: | SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD, BEAM DETERMINATION METHOD AND APPARATUSES THEREFOR | [2021/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAL, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE FAISCEAU ET APPAREILS ASSOCIÉS | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2021 | Translation filed | 12.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 08.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN108024365 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-7,15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2018144844 (IDAC HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1-7,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0183] * * figure 10 *; | [P]US2019199496 (QIN YI [SE], et al) [P] * paragraphs [0528] - [0551] * * figure 6 *; | [XI] - CATT, "Consideration on beam management", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, CZ; 20171009 - 20171013, (20171008), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1717812, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20171008), XP051340997 [X] 1,2,4,5,7,15 * pages 7-9, line section 3 * [I] 3,6 | [XI] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Beam management for NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20180820 - 20180824, (20180811), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1809423 BEAM MANAGEMENT FOR NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F94/Docs/R1%2D1809423%2Ezip, (20180811), XP051516786 [X] 11,13 * section 17, 18; pages 10, 11 * [I] 9,10,12 |