EP3830355 - CONTROL STRUCTURE WITH ROTARY FORCE LIMITER AND ENERGY DISSIPATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allen, John Damian 32A Owens Road Epsom Auckland 1023 / NZ | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19849668.9 | 16.08.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019IB56940 | Priority number, date | NZ20120187454 | 17.08.2018 Original published format: NZ 18745412 | NZ18745493 | 20.08.2018 Original published format: NZ 18745493 | NZ18745931 | 31.08.2018 Original published format: NZ 18745931 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035822 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830355 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 20.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/98, E04H9/02, F16F7/12, F16F7/02 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
B65G1/02 (EP);
F16F7/104 (AU);
E04H9/0237 (EP,US);
B65G1/14 (AU);
E04H9/02 (AU);
E04H9/0215 (AU);
B65G2207/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSTRUKTUR MIT DREHKRAFTBEGRENZER UND ENERGIEABLEITER | [2021/23] | English: | CONTROL STRUCTURE WITH ROTARY FORCE LIMITER AND ENERGY DISSIPATER | [2021/23] | French: | STRUCTURE DE COMMANDE AVEC LIMITEUR DE FORCE DE ROTATION ET DISSIPATEUR D'ÉNERGIE | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 02.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 14.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.12.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62197574 (HAZAMA GUMI) [X] 1-16 * claim 1 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5161655 (SHIMODA IKUO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 8 - column 9, line 10 * * figures 1-8 *; | [I]JP2002338018 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0008] - [0015] * * figures 1-9 *; | [A]JP2008121347 (DAISHU KENSETSU KK) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0017] - [0033] * * figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP2475829 (BALDUCCI ALESSANDRO [IT]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0038] - [0074] * * figures 1-14 *; | [A]EP2537999 (OKURA KENHO [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0031] - [0067] ** figures 1-21 * | International search | [Y]US5161655 (SHIMODA IKUO [JP]) [Y] 1, 8-10, 14, 16, 17, 19 * Col. 2 lines 4-52; Col. 5 line 16 - Col 6 line 28, Col. 7 line 63 - Col. 8 line 15; Figures 1-7 *; | [Y]JP2002338018 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al) [Y] 1, 8-10, 14, 16, 17, 19 * & Machine Translation via Google Patents Paragraph [0010]; Figure 2 *; | [X]WO2009124985 (UNIV GIRONA [ES], et al) [X] 22, 25 * Page 6 lines 28-37, Figures *; | [X]US2010293873 (MUALLA IMAD H [DK]) [X] 1, 8-10, 14, 16, 17, 19 * Paragraphs [0133], [0139], [0144]-[0148]; Figures *; | [PA]WO2018150235 (ALLEN JOHN DAMIAN [NZ]) |