EP3836827 - DISCRIMINATION OF CALCULI AND TISSUES WITH MOLECULAR CHEMICAL IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ChemImage Corporation 7325 Penn Avenue, Suite 200 Pittsburgh, PA 15208 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states ChemImage Corporation 7325 Penn Avenue Suite 200 Pittsburgh, PA 15208 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Jeffrey 5815 Wilkins Avenue Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15217 / US | 02 /
TREADO, Patrick 315 S. Lexington Avenue Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15208 / US | 03 /
STEWART, Shona 1114 Savannah Avenue Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15218 / US | 04 /
GOMER, Heather c/o ChemImage Corporation 7325 Penn Avenue, Suite 200 Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15208 / US | 05 /
SAMIEI, Arash c/o ChemImage Corporation 7325 Penn Avenue, Suite 200 Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15208 / US | 06 /
ZRIMSEK, Alyssa c/o ChemImage Corporation 7325 Penn Avenue, Suite 200 Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15208 / US | 07 /
WANG, Jihang c/o ChemImage Corporation 7325 Penn Avenue, Suite 200 Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15208 / US | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19849782.8 | 19.08.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019US47064 | Priority number, date | US201862719462P | 17.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862719462 P | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020037315 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3836827 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/07, A61B90/30, A61B1/00, A61B1/04, A61B1/06 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
A61B1/000094 (EP,US);
A61B1/00009 (KR);
A61B1/043 (EP,KR);
A61B1/0638 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/0646 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/3132 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/25] | A61B1/07, A61B90/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | UNTERSCHEIDUNG VON STEINEN UND GEWEBE MIT CHEMISCH-MOLEKULARER BILDGEBUNG | [2021/25] | English: | DISCRIMINATION OF CALCULI AND TISSUES WITH MOLECULAR CHEMICAL IMAGING | [2021/25] | French: | DISCRIMINATION DE CALCULS ET DE TISSUS PAR IMAGERIE CHIMIQUE MOLÉCULAIRE | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 11.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 21.07.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 21.07.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.07.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.07.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 21.07.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.07.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2009156900 (ROBERTSON DAVID W [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * paragraphs [0024] - [0058] * * figures 1-12 * [Y] 3,7,11 [I] 12-15; | [Y]US2015257635 (KUBO KEI [JP], et al) [Y] 3,7,11* paragraphs [0026] , [0037] *; | [XY]US2018116494 (TREADO PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0035] - [0040] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0048] * * figures 1, 4 * * paragraph [0060] * [Y] 3,7,11 | International search | [A]US2012083678 (DRAUCH AMY [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]US2013176568 (PRIORE RYAN J [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]US2015282749 (ZAND JASON MATTHEW [US], et al) [A] 1-18* entire document *; | [Y]US2017249744 (WANG LILONG [CN], et al) [Y] 1-18 * entire document *; | [Y]US2018116494 (TREADO PATRICK [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * entire document * |