EP3828982 - NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION AND NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/22] | NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION AND NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY | ||
[2023/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Central Glass Co., Ltd. 5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORINAKA, Takayoshi c/o Chemical Research Center (Ube), CENTRAL GLASS CO., LTD., 5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP | 02 /
KAWAHARA, Kei c/o Chemical Research Center (Ube), CENTRAL GLASS CO., LTD., 5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP | 03 /
KAWABATA, Wataru c/o Chemical Research Center (Ube), CENTRAL GLASS CO., LTD., 5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP | 04 /
MORI, Katsumasa c/o Chemical Research Center (Ube), CENTRAL GLASS CO., LTD., 5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP | 05 /
TAKAHASHI, Mikihiro c/o Chemical Research Center (Ube), CENTRAL GLASS CO., LTD., 5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 19850705.5 | 16.08.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019JP32140 | Priority number, date | JP20180153181 | 16.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018153181 | [2021/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020036222 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3828982 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3828982 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0567, H01M10/054, H01M10/0525 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/054 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0568 (KR,US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M2300/0025 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/22] | H01M10/0568, H01M10/0567 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTWÄSSRIGE ELEKTROLYTLÖSUNG UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT NICHTWÄSSRIGEM ELEKTROLYTEN | [2023/11] | English: | NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION AND NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY | [2023/11] | French: | SOLUTION ÉLECTROLYTIQUE NON-AQUEUSE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON-AQUEUX | [2023/11] |
Former [2021/22] | WASSERFREIE ELEKTROLYTLÖSUNG UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT | ||
Former [2021/22] | NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION AND NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY | ||
Former [2021/22] | SOLUTION ÉLECTROLYTIQUE NON AQUEUSE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2021 | Translation filed | 24.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 14.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 08.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IE | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LU | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
IE | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3261166 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * * examples 1.1-1.65; table 3 * * examples 2.1-2.43; table 6 * * examples 3.1-3.39; table 7 * * examples 3.40-3.52; table 8 * * examples 4.1-4.39; table 9 * * examples 5.1-5.13; table 11 ** claims 1, 3, 10-13 *; | [A]EP3349290 (SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052] * * table 1; compounds 6-11 * * examples 7-12; table 3 * * examples 18-23; table 4 * * claims 1-11 * | International search | [A]WO2017111143 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP])[A] 1-17; | [A]US2017271715 (KIM AERAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-17 * &KR 10-2017-0108589 * | by applicant | JP2002151077 | WO2004042851 | WO2004100293 | US7135252 | JP2007018883 | WO2007083155 | JP2008016424 | JP2008270201 | JP2009137834 | JP2009176752 | CN101654229 | JP2010254554 | WO2011024251 | CN102617414 | JP2013030284 | JP2013051122 | WO2013118661 | WO2014034043 | US2017271715 |