EP3841574 - TRAINING PROCEDURE FOR RECEIVERS ASSOCIATED WITH A MEMORY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. 8000 S Federal Way Boise, Idaho 83716-9632 / US | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAYER, Peter 8000 S. Federal Way Boise, Idaho 83716-9632 / US | 02 /
HEIN, Thomas 8000 S. Federal Way Boise, Idaho 83716-9632 / US | 03 /
BROX, Martin 8000 S. Federal Way Boise, Idaho 83716-9632 / US | 04 /
SPIRKL, Wolfgang, Anton 8000 S. Federal Way Boise, Idaho 83716-9632 / US | 05 /
RICHTER, Michael, Dieter 8000 S. Federal Way Boise, Idaho 83716-9632 / US | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | Pio, Federico Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 19850933.3 | 13.08.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019US46398 | Priority number, date | US201862720817P | 21.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862720817 P | US201916538329 | 12.08.2019 Original published format: US201916538329 | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020041045 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841574 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/22, G11C7/10, G06F3/06, G06F13/40 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
G06F11/1004 (EP,US);
G11C7/22 (KR);
G06F13/1668 (US);
G06F13/4072 (EP);
G06F3/061 (KR);
G11C7/1048 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/26] | G11C7/22, G11C7/10, G06F3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | TRAININGSVERFAHREN FÜR MIT EINER SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG ASSOZIIERTE EMPFÄNGER | [2021/26] | English: | TRAINING PROCEDURE FOR RECEIVERS ASSOCIATED WITH A MEMORY DEVICE | [2021/26] | French: | PROCÉDURE D'APPRENTISSAGE DESTINÉE À DES RÉCEPTEURS ASSOCIÉS À UN DISPOSITIF DE MÉMOIRE | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 10.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6348882 (CICCONE JOHN CHARLES [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 32 - column 4, line 42; figures 1, 2 *; | [XI]US2009310404 (CHO KYOUNG LAE [KR], et al) [X] 6-8,11,14,15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0111]; figures 1-4 * [I] 9,10,12,13; | [A]US2011016372 (NELSON SCOTT [CA], et al) [A] 6-15* paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP2624511 (ALTERA CORP [US]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0043]; figure 7 * | International search | [A]US2002196510 (HIETALA VINCENT MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0057]-[0060]; claim 1; and figure 2. *; | [AY]US2005069031 (SUNTER STEPHEN K [CA], et al) [A] 6-25 * See paragraphs [0057], [0064], [0070], [0102]-[0103]; claims 1, 15, 41; and figures 2A, 11. * [Y] 1-5; | [Y]US2005132158 (HAMPEL CRAIG E [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * See paragraphs [0096], [0119], [0444]; and claims 1, 3. *; | [A]US2010244799 (MOUSSAOUI ZAKI [US]) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0030]; claim 1; and figure 4. *; | [A]US9942028 (DICKSON TIMOTHY O [US], et al) [A] 1-25* See column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 36; claim 1; and figure 2. * |