EP3819367 - CELL CULTURE SUPPORT DEVICE OPERATING PROGRAM, CELL CULTURE SUPPORT DEVICE, AND CELL CULTURE SUPPORT DEVICE OPERATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOGUCHI, Yukihisa c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 577, Ushijima, Kaisei- machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
HASEGAWA, Masataka c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 577, Ushijima, Kaisei- machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 19851034.9 | 31.05.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019JP21822 | Priority number, date | JP20180155748 | 22.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018155748 | [2021/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020039683 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3819367 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, C12M3/00, C12N5/10, C12P21/08 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
C12M41/48 (EP,US);
C12M41/46 (US);
G16B40/00 (US);
G06N3/084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | BETRIEBSPROGRAMM FÜR ZELLKULTURTRÄGERVORRICHTUNG, ZELLKULTURTRÄGERVORRICHTUNG UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE ZELLKULTURTRÄGERVORRICHTUNG | [2021/19] | English: | CELL CULTURE SUPPORT DEVICE OPERATING PROGRAM, CELL CULTURE SUPPORT DEVICE, AND CELL CULTURE SUPPORT DEVICE OPERATING METHOD | [2021/19] | French: | PROGRAMME D'EXPLOITATION DE DISPOSITIF D'AIDE À LA CULTURE CELLULAIRE, DISPOSITIF D'AIDE À LA CULTURE CELLULAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXPLOITATION DE DISPOSITIF D'AIDE À LA CULTURE CELLULAIRE | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2021 | Translation filed | 02.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 26.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP1816188 (HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP]) [I] 1,3,5-8 * paragraph [0041]; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 2,4; | [A] - WYSOTZKI FRITZ, "MACHINE LEARNING AND ITS APPLICATION TO PROCESS CONTROL", OPERATIONS RESEARCH '91, (19910101), XP055795675 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2009044974 (UNIV NAGOYA) [A] 1-8 * , claims (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2011021391 (UNIV NAGOYA NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * , claims (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2018142702 (NIKON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , claims (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2009044974 |