EP3841922 - POSTURE CORRECTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gwak, Taeyeong (Woo Bang Dream City, GamSamDong) 104-1707, 242, Janggi-ro Dalseo-Gu Daegu 42689 / KR | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 19851981.1 | 16.08.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019KR10423 | Priority number, date | KR20180098089 | 22.08.2018 Original published format: KR 20180098089 | KR20190099928 | 14.08.2019 Original published format: KR 20190099928 | [2021/26] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020040488 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841922 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47C31/12, A47B95/00, A61F5/01, A61B5/11, G08B3/10 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
F16M13/022 (EP);
A47C31/126 (KR);
A47B97/00 (EP,US);
A47B95/00 (EP,KR);
A47C31/12 (EP);
A61B5/11 (EP);
A61B5/1116 (EP,KR);
A61F5/01 (EP,KR);
F16M11/046 (EP);
F16M11/10 (EP);
F16M11/14 (US);
F16M11/2021 (EP);
F16M11/2092 (EP);
F16M11/28 (EP);
F16M11/40 (EP);
G08B3/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | HALTUNGSKORREKTURVORRICHTUNG | [2021/26] | English: | POSTURE CORRECTING APPARATUS | [2021/26] | French: | APPAREIL DE CORRECTION DE POSITION | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2020 | Translation filed | 06.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 27.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20110004790U ; | [XI]KR20160031346 (JEONG MIN CHAN [KR]) | International search | [Y]JP3010376U (KOJI, ONIIKE) [Y] 5, 8-11, 17-19; | [Y]KR20100116152 (LEE YO SEOB [KR]) [Y] 2-4, 7; | [A]US2012187727 (WU GUODOU [CN])[A] 1-19; | [XY]KR101546249B (UNIV SUNGKYUNKWAN RES & BUS [KR]) [X] 1, 6, 12-16 [Y] 2-5, 7-11, 17-19; | [A]KR20150129471 (O BYEONG YONG [KR]) [A] 1-19 |