EP3808807 - POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION AND OPTICAL MOLDED PRODUCT COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEON, Byoungkue LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
YANG, Young In LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
HWANG, Daehyeon LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
HONG, Mooho LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Ki Jae LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
SON, Youngwook LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19852112.2 | 19.08.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019KR10497 | Priority number, date | KR20180096966 | 20.08.2018 Original published format: KR 20180096966 | [2021/16] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020040504 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3808807 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/17, C08L69/00, C08G64/16, G02B1/04 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
C08G64/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/20 (KR);
C08L69/005 (US);
C08G64/16 (KR);
C08K5/005 (KR);
C08K5/175 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (KR);
G02B1/04 (KR);
G02B1/041 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/175, C08L69/00 (EP);
G02B1/041, C08K5/005, C08L69/00 (EP);
G02B1/041, C08K5/175, C08L69/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/16] | C08K5/20, C08L69/00, C08K5/00, C08G64/16, G02B1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | POLYCARBONATHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND OPTISCHES FORMPRODUKT DAMIT | [2021/16] | English: | POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION AND OPTICAL MOLDED PRODUCT COMPRISING SAME | [2021/16] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE POLYCARBONATE ET PRODUIT MOULÉ OPTIQUE LA COMPRENANT | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2021 | Translation filed | 12.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 17.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004126700 (LEE MING-CHIA [TW], et al) [A] 1-10* figure 8; claims 10,14 * | International search | [A]US5869554 (PICKETT JAMES EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-10* See the entire document. *; | [Y]KR20020088420 (BAYER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [Y] 1-10 * See abstract; claims 1, 6; and page 31. *; | [A]KR20100017306 (CLARIANT FINANCE BVI LTD [VG], et al) [A] 1-10 * See claim 4, chemical formula IV. *; | [Y]WO2015186015 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]) [Y] 1-10 * See claims 1, 18. *; | [A]US2016229954 (NEGISHI YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * See the entire document. * |