EP3842887 - AUTOMATIC TRAVEL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yanmar Power Technology Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0013 / JP | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHII, Yasuto c/o YANMAR CO., LTD. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Poindron, Cyrille, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 19852347.4 | 11.07.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019JP27505 | Priority number, date | JP20180157521 | 24.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018157521 | [2021/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020039786 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3842887 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, A01B69/04, B60W30/10, G05D1/00, B60W30/18, B60W30/182 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
G05D1/0219 (EP);
A01B69/00 (KR);
G05D1/0214 (US);
A01B69/008 (EP,US);
B60Q9/00 (US);
B60W30/00 (KR);
B60W30/10 (EP);
B60W30/18145 (EP);
B60W30/182 (EP);
G05D1/0044 (EP);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D1/0278 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/26] | G05D1/02, A01B69/00, B60W30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES FAHRSYSTEM | [2021/26] | English: | AUTOMATIC TRAVEL SYSTEM | [2021/26] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉPLACEMENT AUTOMATIQUE | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2021 | Translation filed | 09.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 31.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN106647770 (WUXI KALMAN NAVIGATION TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0004] - [0013] - [0025] - [0028]; figures 1-3 * [I] 2-5; | [XI]WO2018047500 (YANMAR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0046] - [0047] *[I] 2-5; | [A]US2018084716 (TAKAHARA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * cited as example to support the affirmation that the subject-matter of claims 2-5 is obvious.; paragraphs [0011] - [0021] - [0042] - [0043]; claim 1 * | International search | [A]JP2015112056 (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0032], [0053]-[0061] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2017174229 (YANMAR CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , claim 1 & WO 2017/159615 A1 *; | [A]JP2017221164 (KUBOTA KK) [A] 1-6* , paragraphs [0013], [0017] & US 2019/0186922 A1, paragraphs [0021], [0026] & EP 3473070 A1 & CN 109152330 A * | by applicant | JP2018075027 |