EP3841338 - CONTAINER WITH ONE OR MORE TRAY RETENTION PORTIONS AND SUPPORT STAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Igloo Products Corp. 777 Igloo Road Katy, TX 77494 / US | [2023/28] |
Former [2021/26] | For all designated states Igloo Products Corp. 777 Igloo Road Katy, TX 77494 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUONG, Quang Lee 24715 Cobble Canyon Lane Katy, TX 77494 / US | 02 /
ESPINOSA, Herman Sebastian Cousin 4607 Westgreen Ridge Road Katy, TX 77449 / US | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2021/26] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19852524.8 | 20.08.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019US47151 | Priority number, date | US201862720466P | 21.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862720466 P | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020041236 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841338 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3841338 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A45C11/20, A45C13/28, A47B37/04, // A47B5/00 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
A47B37/04 (EP,KR);
A45C11/20 (EP,KR);
B65D25/20 (US);
A45C13/28 (EP,KR);
A47B5/04 (US);
B62B1/186 (US);
B62B5/067 (US);
B65D25/10 (US);
B65D25/2841 (US);
B65D43/163 (US);
B65D51/24 (US);
B65D81/38 (KR);
B65D81/3813 (US);
F25D3/08 (KR);
A47B5/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | A45C11/20, A45C13/28 | ||
Former IPC [2021/26] | F25D3/08, A45C11/20, A45C13/28, A45F3/46, B65D81/38, F25D3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER MIT EINEM ODER MEHREREN SCHALENHALTEABSCHNITTEN UND STÜTZSTÄNDER | [2021/26] | English: | CONTAINER WITH ONE OR MORE TRAY RETENTION PORTIONS AND SUPPORT STAND | [2021/26] | French: | CONTENANT DOTÉ D'UNE OU PLUSIEURS PARTIES DE RETENUE DE PLATEAU ET SOCLE DE SUPPORT | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 24.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | IE | 20.08.2023 | LU | 20.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | FR | 12.09.2023 | GB | 12.10.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | DE | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 20.08.2023 | ||
LU | 20.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
FR | 12.09.2023 | ||
GB | 12.10.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
DE | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 20.08.2023 | ||
LU | 20.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
GB | 12.10.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
DE | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 20.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 20.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 20.08.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 20.08.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US5480170 (KAISER II RONALD R [US]); | [Y]JPH10129750 (ZOJIRUSHI CORP); | [X]US6311991 (CONRADO ANN-MARIE [US], et al); | [A]US2010000893 (TWIG NOAM [IL], et al); | [A]US9476638 (TYLER LANIE J [US]) | International search | [Y]US1455395 (EXUM MARY E); | [XY]US5306029 (KAISER II RONALD R [US]); | [A]US5660296 (GREENWICH RYAN E [US]); | [Y]US7451709 (SWARTFAGER BRIAN ALLEN [US], et al); | [Y]US7854321 (TWIG NOAM [IL], et al); | [Y]US9480324 (ANGELOZZI MICHAEL [CA], et al); | [Y]US2017115045 (AIKEN LORAN BRUEGGEN [US]); | [A]US2017129097 (ENGVALL DAVID P [US], et al) |