EP3824720 - ABSORBENT SHEET FOR PET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAWA, Ayano c/o Technical Center of Unicharm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
SASANO, Yasuhiro c/o Technical Center of Unicharm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 19852842.4 | 15.08.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019JP32043 | Priority number, date | JP20180154254 | 20.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018154254 | JP20180154252 | 20.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018154252 | JP20180003202U | 20.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018003202 U | [2021/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020040035 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3824720 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/015 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
A01K1/0157 (EP,US);
B32B3/04 (US);
B32B2307/4023 (US);
B32B2307/726 (US);
B32B2451/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | SAUGFÄHIGES TUCH FÜR HAUSTIER | [2021/21] | English: | ABSORBENT SHEET FOR PET | [2021/21] | French: | FEUILLE ABSORBANTE POUR ANIMAL DE COMPAGNIE | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2021 | Translation filed | 22.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 25.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1118603 (UNI CHARM CORP); | [X]KR20090046623 (YUHAN KIMBERLY LTD [KR]); | [XI]EP2856864 (UNICHARM CORP [JP]); | [X]US2017013799 (BOLTON JONATHAN [US]) | International search | [XY]KR20090046623 (YUHAN KIMBERLY LTD [KR]) [X] 1-7 * , * [Y] 1-28; | [XY]JP2013247922 (UNICHARM CORP) [X] 1-7 * , * [Y] 1-28; | [XY]US2017013799 (BOLTON JONATHAN [US]) [X] 1-7 * , * [Y] 1-28; | [Y]JP2017093320 (UNI CHARM CORP) [Y] 8-28 * , *; | [Y]JP2016103990 (UNI CHARM CORP) [Y] 12-28 * , * | by applicant | JP2012029625 | JP2014068591 | JP2018154252 | JP2018154254 |