EP3844175 - COMBINATION THERAPIES COMPRISING PD-1-BASED CHIMERIC PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shattuck Labs, Inc. 1018 West 11th Street Austin TX 78703 / US | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHREIBER, Taylor c/o Shattuck Labs, Inc. 1018 West 11th Street Austin, TX 78703 / US | 02 /
FROMM, George c/o Shattuck Labs, Inc. 1018 West 11th Street Austin, TX 78703 / US | 03 /
DE SILVA, Suresh c/o Shattuck Labs, Inc. 1018 West 11th Street Austin, TX 78703 / US | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/27] | Gibson, Mark Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19853526.2 | 29.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019US48923 | Priority number, date | US201862724600P | 29.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862724600 P | US201862734951P | 21.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862734951 P | US201962793235P | 16.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962793235 P | US201962832830P | 11.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962832830 P | US201962890217P | 22.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962890217 P | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020047328 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3844175 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00, C07K19/00, C12N15/85, A61K38/00, C12N7/00 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,IL);
C07K16/2818 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/7084 (US);
A61K38/1774 (EP,IL,US);
A61K38/191 (US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,IL);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL);
A61K47/65 (US);
A61K47/68 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,US);
C07K14/70521 (US);
C07K14/70575 (US);
C07K14/70578 (US);
C07K14/70596 (EP,IL);
C07K16/2863 (EP,IL);
C07K16/2887 (EP,IL);
C07K16/32 (EP,IL);
A01K2207/12 (EP,IL);
A01K2227/105 (EP,IL);
A01K2267/0331 (EP,IL);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL);
A61K2300/00 (IL);
A61K38/00 (US);
C07K2317/524 (US);
C07K2317/526 (US);
C07K2317/53 (US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US);
C07K2319/33 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1774, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIEN MIT PD-1-BASIERTEN CHIMÄREN PROTEINEN | [2021/27] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPIES COMPRISING PD-1-BASED CHIMERIC PROTEINS | [2021/27] | French: | THÉRAPIES COMBINÉES COMPRENANT DES PROTÉINES CHIMÉRIQUES À BASE DE PD -1 | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 20.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2017059168 (HEAT BIOLOGICS INC [US]); | [X]US2018064787 (SCHREIBER TAYLOR [US], et al); | [I]WO2018127917 (KAHR MEDICAL LTD [IL]) | International search | [A]US2012100139 (THOMPSON PETER ARMSTRONG [US], et al); | [X]US2018064787 (SCHREIBER TAYLOR [US], et al) |