EP3844899 - CLOCK SYNCHRONIZATION IN A CENTRALIZED RADIO ACCESS NETWORK HAVING MULTIPLE CONTROLLERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 3642 E US Highway 70 Claremont NC 28610 / US | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/27] | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDBERG, Stuart D. c/o CommScope Technologies LLC Claremont, NC 28610 / US | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/27] | 01 /
SANDBERG, Stuart D. c/o CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2024/18] |
Former [2021/27] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19854288.8 | 28.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019US48609 | Priority number, date | US201862724493P | 29.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862724493 P | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020047126 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3844899 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3844899 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06, H04W88/08 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
H04J3/0641 (EP);
H04W56/0015 (US);
H04J3/0658 (EP);
H04J3/0667 (EP);
H04W84/042 (US);
H04W88/085 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/27] | H04J3/06, H04L12/931 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TAKTSYNCHRONISIERUNG IN EINEM ZENTRALISIERTEN FUNKZUGANGSNETZWERK MIT MEHREREN STEUERGERÄTEN | [2021/27] | English: | CLOCK SYNCHRONIZATION IN A CENTRALIZED RADIO ACCESS NETWORK HAVING MULTIPLE CONTROLLERS | [2021/27] | French: | SYNCHRONISATION D'HORLOGE DANS UN RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS RADIOÉLECTRIQUE CENTRALISÉ COMPORTANT DE MULTIPLES DISPOSITIFS DE COMMANDE | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 24.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017150464 (KAZEHAYA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0041] * * figures 3,7,10,18 * * paragraphs [0062] , [0 65] , [0067] * * page 128 * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0135] * * paragraphs [0139] , [ 142] *; | [A]WO2017184685 (CENTURYLINK IP LLC [US]) [A] 1,9 * figure 4 ** paragraphs [0004] , [0019] , [0021] *; | [A]WO2018017468 (PHLUIDO INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 2,4,5 * * page 7, line 3 - line 8 * * page 14, line 28 - page 15, paragraph l * * page 22, line 22 - line 27 * * page 24, line 15 - line 17 * * page 24, line 24 - line 26 * * page 26, line 24 - page 27, line 17 * * page 28, line 8 - line 10 *; | [A] - VENMANI DANIEL PHILIP ET AL, "On the role of network synchronization for future cellular networks: an operator's perspective", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, vol. 54, no. 9, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2016.7565273, ISSN 0163-6804, (20160901), pages 58 - 64, (20160912), XP011623236 [A] 1-15 * figures 1,4 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0019] , [0021] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2016.7565273 | International search | [A]KR20170050361 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0051]-[0059]; and figure 3. *; | [A]US2018206203 (RUFFINI STEFANO [IT], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0053]; and figure 1. *; | [Y] - AAMIR MAHMOOD et al., "Over-the-Air Time Synchronization for URLLC: Requirements, Challenges and Possible Enablers", 2018 15th International Symposium on Wireless Communication Systems (ISWCS),, (20180629), pages 1 - 6, XP033420434 [Y] 1-20 * See sections II, IV-V. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISWCS.2018.8491188 | [Y] - DANIEL PHILIP VENMANI et al., "On the role of network synchronization for future cellular networks: an operator's perspective", (20160916), URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/document/7565273, XP011623236 [Y] 1-20 * See pages 59-63; and figures 1, 4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2016.7565273 | [Y] - Bjørn Øyvind Andersen, "5G Ethernet X-Haul", WHITE PAPER, (20180621), URL: http://elektronikknett.no/Whitepapers/5G-Ethernet-X-Haul, (20191209), XP009526119 [Y] 7, 17 * See section 3.1. * |