02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
24.05.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
29.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] |
16.06.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
09.06.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.06.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.06.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.02.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.02.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.01.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
20.01.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
23.02.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.12.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.11.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
05.11.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
29.09.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
28.09.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
12.06.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
04.06.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
10.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.02.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.02.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
12.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.11.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
07.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|