EP3844552 - DISPLAY APPARATUS AND DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO., LTD. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Wei No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Xiaochuan No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Jiayao No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
MENG, Xianqin No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
MENG, Xiandong No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 06 /
TAN, Jifeng No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 07 /
LIANG, Pengxia No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 08 /
GAO, Jian No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 09 /
WANG, Fangzhou No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 10 /
LING, Qiuyu No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19854609.5 | 29.03.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019CN80385 | Priority number, date | CN201810986338 | 28.08.2018 Original published format: CN201810986338 | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020042605 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3844552 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/22, G02B27/02, G02B30/26, H04N13/351, G02B27/01 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
G02B30/30 (EP);
H04N13/337 (US);
G02B27/0172 (EP);
G02B27/30 (US);
G02B27/44 (US);
G02B30/26 (EP);
G02B5/1819 (EP);
H04N13/351 (EP,US);
G02B2027/013 (EP);
G02B2027/0134 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/27] | G02B21/22, G02B27/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND ANZEIGESYSTEM | [2021/27] | English: | DISPLAY APPARATUS AND DISPLAY SYSTEM | [2021/27] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE ET SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2020 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 25.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CA2815452 (LOCKHEED CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, lines 1-17; figures 1,2 ** page 23, lines 23-25 *; | [Y]CN106371218 (SVG OPTRONICS CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1,3-5,7-11,13-15 * figures 3,4,5a-5j,7,12,15b,16,19,22,25 *; | [Y]CN206147186U (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 1-9,11-13,15 * paragraph [0009]; figures 2a,2d,3a-3c,4,7,8,9,12 * | International search | [Y]CN202615044U (TAN ZHENG) [Y] 1-27 * description paragraphs 0018-0022 and figures 1-2 *; | [Y]CN204613517U (WANG ZHIJIAN) [Y] 1-27 * description paragraphs 0031-0047 and figures 1-11 *; | [Y]CN205485086U (GUANGDONG FUTURE TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-27* description paragraphs 0027-0056 and figures 1-6 *; | [Y]CN106324847 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 1-27 * description paragraphs 0055-0107 and figures 1a-13 *; | [Y]CN206147186U (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 1-27 * description paragraphs 0055-0107 and figures 1a-13 * | by applicant | CA2815452 | CN106371218 | CN206147186U |