EP3845657 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ORGANIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMIZU Satoshi c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 32, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | 02 /
HAMACHI Kokoro c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 32, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19854819.0 | 27.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019JP33501 | Priority number, date | JP20180158538 | 27.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018158538 | [2021/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020045422 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3845657 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/04 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
C12P7/18 (EP);
C12P7/065 (EP,US);
C12N1/02 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12P7/08 (US);
C12P7/54 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ORGANISCHEN STOFFES | [2021/27] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ORGANIC MATERIAL | [2021/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MATÉRIAU ORGANIQUE | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2021 | Translation filed | 26.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 19.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5747471 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,7* the whole document *; | [X]US8309773 (JEVTIC RADMILA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * column 1, line 20 - line 50 * * column 5, line 43 - line 49; example 2; table 9 * | International search | [Y]JPS5416414 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK) [Y] 3-4 * , *; | [Y]JPS5747471 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 3-4 * , *; | [A]JPH05123165 (AJINOMOTO KK) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [A]JPH0856584 (SANWA SHIYURUI KK, et al) [A] 1-7* , *; | [A]JP2008278825 (CHUO KAKOKI, et al) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [XY]WO2011064450 (ST1 BIOFUELS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-4, 7 * , * [Y] 5-6; | [A]JP2014003915 (TSUKISHIMA KIKAI CO) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [XY]JP2017123791 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-2, 5-7 * , * [Y] 3-6 | by applicant | JP2008545403 | JP2011177159 | US2017260552 |