EP3845698 - TOP-OPEN TYPE WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingdao Haier Washing Machine Co., Ltd. No.1 Haier Road Hi-Tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | For all designated states Qingdao Haier Smart Technology R&D Co., Ltd. Hi-tech Industrial Park No. 1 Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | For all designated states Haier Smart Home Co., Ltd. No.1 Haier Road, Laoshan Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yimin No.1 Haier Road, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Haitao No.1 Haier Road, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 03 /
LAO, Chunfeng No.1 Haier Road, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 04 /
XU, Sheng No.1 Haier Road, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Denninger Str. 169 81925 München / DE | [2023/52] |
Former [2021/27] | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstraße 14 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19855736.5 | 16.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019CN100998 | Priority number, date | CN201810981402 | 27.08.2018 Original published format: CN201810981402 | [2021/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020042922 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3845698 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3845698 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/06, // D06F23/02, D06F39/08 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
D06F37/06 (EP,CN);
D06F39/083 (EP,CN);
D06F23/025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/27] | D06F37/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VON OBEN ZU ÖFFNENDE WASCHMASCHINE | [2021/27] | English: | TOP-OPEN TYPE WASHING MACHINE | [2021/27] | French: | LAVE-LINGE À CHARGEMENT PAR LE HAUT | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2021 | Translation filed | 25.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 25.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0204734 (DYSON LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 7 - page 15, line 25 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP2557215 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0019] - [0038] ** pages 1-4 *; | [A]CN104452184 (HISENSE RONSHEN GUANGDONG REFRIGERATORS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0050] - [0097] * * pages 1-6 * |