EP3687947 - FLOW-DIVERGER FEED INLET DISTRIBUTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bechtel Energy Inc. 3000 Post Oak Blvd. Houston, TX 77056-6503 / US | [2021/33] |
Former [2020/32] | For all designated states Bechtel Oil, Gas and Chemicals, Inc. 3000 Post Oak Blvd. Houston, TX 77056-6503 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUSE, Charles, Joseph 15714 Ladino Run Street Cypress, TX 77429 / US | 02 /
POORMAN, Qui, Truong 4631 Autumn Orchard Lane Katy, TX 77494 / US | 03 /
RAJU, Reni 686 Cumberland Ridge Lane League City, TX 77573 / US | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Docherty, Andrew John Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | Docherty, Andrew John Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19855941.1 | 29.08.2019 | [2020/32] | WO2019US48747 | Priority number, date | US201862724486P | 29.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862724486 P | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020047214 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3687947 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3687947 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/20, B01D21/00, B01D21/34, B01D47/02, B01J19/00, B05B1/34, G05D7/01 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
B01D49/003 (EP);
B01D19/0042 (US);
B01D17/12 (EP);
B01D19/0063 (EP);
F15D1/0005 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIVERGIERENDER EINLASSVERTEILER | [2021/26] | English: | FLOW-DIVERGER FEED INLET DISTRIBUTOR | [2020/32] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR D'ADMISSION À FLUX DIVERGENT | [2021/26] |
Former [2020/32] | ZUFUHREINLASSVERTEILER FÜR EINEN FLÜSSIGKEITSVERTEILER | ||
Former [2020/32] | DISTRIBUTEUR D'ADMISSION À DÉRIVATION DE FLUX | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 11.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2019 | AL | 22.09.2021 | AT | 22.09.2021 | CY | 22.09.2021 | CZ | 22.09.2021 | DK | 22.09.2021 | EE | 22.09.2021 | ES | 22.09.2021 | FI | 22.09.2021 | HR | 22.09.2021 | IT | 22.09.2021 | LT | 22.09.2021 | LV | 22.09.2021 | MC | 22.09.2021 | MK | 22.09.2021 | MT | 22.09.2021 | PL | 22.09.2021 | RO | 22.09.2021 | RS | 22.09.2021 | SE | 22.09.2021 | SI | 22.09.2021 | SK | 22.09.2021 | SM | 22.09.2021 | BG | 22.12.2021 | NO | 22.12.2021 | GR | 23.12.2021 | IS | 22.01.2022 | PT | 24.01.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 29.08.2019 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
MK | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 29.08.2019 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 22.09.2021 | |
NO | 22.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9823351 (KVAERNER PALADON LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005018780 (FLASH TECHNOLOGIES N V, et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,6 *; | [X]US8470080 (BALL IV WILL D [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2018154284 (WALKER PATRICK R [US], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0049]; figure 7 * | International search | [A]GB1119699 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [A] 1-20* , Figs. 1-3; pg 1, In 70-80; pg 1, In 127 to pg 2, In 24 *; | [A]US3520116 (GOOD ROBERT RAPHAEL) [A] 1-20 * , Figs. 1, 2; col 1, In 12-20; col 2 ,ln 31 to col 3, In 34 *; | [A]US4591367 (PEK JOHAN J B [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * , Figs. 1-3; col 2, In 27-54; col 5, In 65 to col 6, In 28 *; | [A]US6183541 (COMPTON BILL E [US]) [A] 1-20 * , Figs. 1, 2; col 2, In 29-49; col 3, In 40 to col 4, In 67 *; | [A]US8070141 (KOOIJMAN HENDRIK ADRIAAN [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * . Fig. 1; col 2, In 48-67; col 5, In 63 to col 6, In 28 * |