EP3896225 - TRAFFIC SAFETY WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/42] | ROADWAY SAFETY BARRIER | ||
[2023/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INGECID, S.L. Avda. de los Castros 44 Torre Anexa, Planta 3a 39005 Santander / ES | [2023/34] |
Former [2021/42] | For all designated states Ingecid, Investigación Y Desarrollo de Proyectos, S.L. Bº Rubó s/n 39478 Boo de Piélagos / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICO ARENAL, Jokin Avenida de los Castros, S/N 39005 Santander / ES | 02 /
BALLESTER MUÑOZ, Francisco Avenida de los Castros, S/N 39005 Santander / ES | 03 /
HELGUERA LÓPEZ, David Avenida de los Castros S/N 39005 Santander / ES | 04 /
CEREZO LEZA, Marcos Avenida de los Castros S/N 39005 Santander / ES | 05 /
CAVADA LAZA, Fernando Avenida de los Castros S/N 39005 Santander / ES | 06 /
THOMAS GARCÍA, Carlos Avenida de los Castros S/N 39005 Santander / ES | 07 /
POLANCO MADRAZO, Juan Antonio Avenida de los Castros S/N 39005 Santander / ES | 08 /
SETIÉN MARQUÍNEZ, Jesús Avenida de los Castros S/N 39005 Santander / ES | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | García Gómez, José Donato C/ La Gloria 105, 3º E 39012 Santander / ES | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19856445.2 | 13.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019ES70844 | Priority number, date | ES20180031223 | 14.12.2018 Original published format: ES 201831223 | [2021/42] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020120820 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | ES | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3896225 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3896225 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E01F15/08, E01F15/04 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
E01F15/083 (EP,US);
E01F15/08 (ES);
E01F15/088 (EP,US);
E01F15/0476 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKEHRSSCHUTZWAND | [2023/34] | English: | TRAFFIC SAFETY WALL | [2023/34] | French: | PAROI DE SÉCURITÉ ROUTIÈRE | [2023/34] |
Former [2021/42] | FAHRBAHNSICHERHEITSSPERRE | ||
Former [2021/42] | ROADWAY SAFETY BARRIER | ||
Former [2021/42] | BARRIÈRE DE SÉCURITÉ ROUTIÈRE | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2020 | Translation filed | 13.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 13.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | MC | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0742124 (ASAHI CONCRETE WORKS, et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraphs [0006] , [0014] , [0022] , [0024]; figures 3,6,7,18 *; | [X]KR20110131633 (E CO CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * paragraphs [0026] , [0028]; figure - *; | [X]EP2511422 (URBANTECH S R L [IT]) [X] 1* paragraphs [0002] , [0007]; figure - *; | [X]US9644332 (SMITH MICHAEL J [US]) [X] 1,6 * column 3, lines 33-37; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 46-51 * | by applicant | US4059362 | EP0641893 | EP1106738 |