EP3847078 - TRACK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soucy International Inc. 5450 Rue Saint-Roch Drummondville, Québec J2B 6W3 / CA | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUVAGEAU, Yves 1760 rue Desjardins Drummondville Québec J2B 3Y5 / CA | 02 /
PEPIN, Pierre-Yves 2895 boul. Allard Drummondville Québec J2B 8B8 / CA | 03 /
NADEAU, Marc 3170 Des Jonquilles Drummondville Québec J2B 8J3 / CA | 04 /
NANAC, Branislav 5190 rue Martine Drummondville Québec J2E 1T6 / CA | 05 /
THERRIEN, Genevieve 10 rue de Courval Drummondville Québec J1Z 2H9 / CA | 06 /
TODD, Andre 252 rue Alphonse-Richer Mont St-Hilaire Québec J3H 6J4 / CA | 07 /
ALLIGUIE, Cedric 2855, Avenue Tarte St-Hyacinthe Québec J2R 1K6 / CA | 08 /
LAPALME, Jonathan 1040 rue Morse Drummondville Québec J2B 0A4 / CA | 09 /
DUBUC, Nicolas 1684 Boul. Ste-Marguerite Mercier Québec J6R 2L1 / CA | 10 /
JAILLET-GOSSELIN, Philippe 299 rue Croteau Drummondville Québec J2B 6B7 / CA | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | BCF Global Centre d'Entreprise et d'Innovation 17-21, rue Saint-Fiacre 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | BCF Global Centre d'Entreprise et d'Innovation 56, Bd Niels Bohr CS 52132 69603 Villeurbanne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 19856721.6 | 06.09.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019IB57553 | Priority number, date | US201862728161P | 07.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862728161 P | US201862728662P | 07.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862728662 P | US201862728669P | 07.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862728669 P | US201862728673P | 07.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862728673 P | US201862728690P | 07.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862728690 P | US201862728697P | 07.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862728697 P | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020049533 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3847078 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/084, B62D55/116, B62D55/112, B62D55/14, B62D55/06, B62D55/08 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
B62D55/065 (EP,US);
B60C23/002 (EP);
B62D55/084 (EP,US);
B62D55/10 (US);
B62D55/1125 (EP);
B62D55/116 (EP);
B62D55/14 (EP,US);
B60C2200/08 (US);
B60C23/005 (US);
B60C23/10 (US);
B60C23/16 (US);
B62D11/003 (US);
B62D11/20 (US);
B62D55/12 (US);
B62D55/15 (US);
B62D55/24 (EP,US);
B62D55/244 (US);
B62D55/305 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/28] | B62D11/00, B62D11/20, B62D55/00, B62D55/06, B62D55/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Title | German: | TRACKSYSTEM | [2021/28] | English: | TRACK SYSTEM | [2021/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CHENILLE | [2021/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 02.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2727803 (VEYANCE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [A]US2016068205 (HELLHOLM BJÖRN [SE], et al); | [A]US9682736 (PRICKEL MARVIN A [US], et al) | International search | [A]US3430790 (BELTRAMI OSMANO); | [A]US7017688 (BOWERS LEE N [JP], et al); | [A]US2016068205 (HELLHOLM BJÖRN [SE], et al); | [A]US2016159414 (HANSEN RONALD S [US]); | [YA]WO2017049393 (SOUCY INT INC [CA]); | [XYA]US9682736 (PRICKEL MARVIN A [US], et al); | [XT]WO2020049533 (SOUCY INT INC [CA], et al); | [XT]WO2020049530 (SOUCY INT INC [CA], et al) | by applicant | EP2727803 | US2016068205 | US9682736 |