EP3848736 - OPTICAL FILM SET AND OPTICAL MULTILAYER BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURASHIGE Takeshi c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
INAGAKI Junichi c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
SATO Keisuke c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 04 /
SUGINO Akiko c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 05 /
KAWAMITSU Shoichi c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 06 /
KISHI Atsushi c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 19857407.1 | 27.08.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019JP33518 | Priority number, date | JP20180167043 | 06.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018167043 | [2021/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020050099 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848736 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, B32B7/023, B32B17/10 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
B32B27/306 (EP);
G02B5/3033 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133531 (US);
B32B17/10 (EP);
B32B7/023 (EP,KR);
B32B7/12 (KR);
G02B1/14 (EP);
G02B5/3083 (KR);
G02F1/133528 (KR);
G02F1/133562 (US);
G02F1/133567 (US);
G02F1/13363 (KR,US);
B32B2457/20 (EP);
B32B2457/202 (EP,KR);
G02F2413/02 (US);
G02F2413/05 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER FILMSATZ UND OPTISCHER MEHRSCHICHTKÖRPER | [2021/28] | English: | OPTICAL FILM SET AND OPTICAL MULTILAYER BODY | [2021/28] | French: | ENSEMBLE FILM OPTIQUE ET CORPS MULTICOUCHE OPTIQUE | [2021/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2021 | Translation filed | 04.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 31.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/29] | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015146294 (WATANABE YASUHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0188] , [ 197]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2017057103 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0031] - [0048] *; | [Y]US2018203173 (MURASHIGE TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0009] , [0011] , [0014] , [0015] , [0018] , [0301] *; | [P]US2018267351 (YAMAMOTO SATOSHI [JP], et al) | International search | [A]WO2013175767 (KONICA MINOLTA INC [JP]) [A] 1-20 * , entire text, fig. 1-4 & US 2015/0146294 A1, entire text, fig. 1-4 & CN 104335085 A & KR 10-2015-0004835 A & TW 201409094 A *; | [X]WO2017010499 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-20 * , paragraphs [0002], [0006], [0009]-[0011], [0013]-[0014], [0016], [0022], [0035], [0043], [0046]-[0047], fig. 1 & US 2018/0203173 A1, paragraphs [0002], [0006]-[0010], [0013]-[0016], [0018]-[0019], [0022], [0029]-[0030], [0044], [0054]-[0055], [0058]-[0060], fig. 1 & JP 2017-24177 A & EP 3323609 A1 & KR 10-2018-0018763 A & CN 107848264 A & TW 201730593 A *; | [A]JP2017039227 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC) [A] 1-20* , entire text, fig. 1-2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2017042989 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 1-20 * , entire text, fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2017057103 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * , entire text, fig. 1-3 & US 2018/0267351 A1, entire text, fig. 1-3 & JP 2017-67942 A & CN 108139625 A & KR 10-2018-0059521 A & TW 201726419 A * | by applicant | JP2006309033 | JP2006317560 | JP2006328329 | JP2006328334 | JP2006337491 | JP2006337492 | JP2006337493 | JP2006337569 | JP2007009182 | JP2009161744 | JP2010284840 | JP2012073580 | WO2013175767 |