EP3846886 - VAPORIZER APPARATUSES AND VAPORIZING METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Blinc Group, Inc. 251 West 30th Street, 5th Floor New York, NY 10001 / US | [2024/30] |
Former [2021/28] | For all designated states Bergstrom Innovations, LLC 180 Mindy Avenue Merritt Island FL 32953 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGSTROM, Sam 180 Mindy Ave. Merritt Island, Florida 32953 / US | 02 /
ANKNER, Charles 811-G2 Sky Pine Way Greenacres, Florida 33415 / US | 03 /
TEAGUE, Christopher 900 Century Drive, No. 108 Ogden, Utah 84404 / US | 04 /
CURRENT, Robert 1322 S. Alamo Ave. Tucson, Arizona 85711 / US | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | Proi World Intellectual Property GmbH Obermattweg 12 6052 Hergiswil, Kanton Nidwalden / CH | Application number, filing date | 19857637.3 | 05.09.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019US49829 | Priority number, date | US201862727820P | 06.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862727820 P | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020051385 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3846886 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/06, A24F40/57, A61M11/00, A61M11/04, A61M16/00, A61M16/16 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
A61M11/042 (EP,US);
A24F40/485 (EP,US);
A24F40/42 (US);
A24F40/57 (EP,US);
A24F7/00 (US);
A61M15/0021 (EP,US);
A61M15/06 (EP,US);
A24F40/10 (EP);
A24F40/50 (EP);
A61M11/005 (EP);
A61M16/16 (EP);
A61M2016/0021 (EP);
A61M2205/332 (EP);
A61M2205/3368 (EP);
A61M2205/36 (EP);
A61M2205/3606 (EP);
A61M2205/3673 (EP);
A61M2205/502 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/28] | A61M15/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Title | German: | VERDAMPFERVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERDAMPFUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/28] | English: | VAPORIZER APPARATUSES AND VAPORIZING METHODS | [2021/28] | French: | APPAREILS DE VAPORISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉS DE VAPORISATION | [2021/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 30.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CA2851933 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1-8,10,15 * figures 1-3 * * claims 1, 6, 9 * * page 1, line 17 - line 19 * * page 13, line 2 - line 4 * * page 14, line 13 - page 15, line 33 *[I] 9,11-14 | International search | [A]US2016235122 (KRIETZMAN MARK [US]) [A] 1-3, 38-45 * ; entire document. *; | [XYA]US2016367925 (BLACKLEY JONATHAN SEAMUS [US]) [X] 40, 45 * ; entire document, especially Fig. 6; para. [0082], [0103], [0110], [0113], [0117], [0121]. * [Y] 38-39 [A] 41-44; | [A]US2017135409 (CAMERON JOHN [US]) [A] 41-44 * ; entire document, especially Abstract, para. [0163]. *; | [X]US2017208863 (DAVIS MICHAEL F [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * ; entire document, especiall7 Fig. 2-4; para. [0001], [0044], [0047], [0054], [0056], [0074], [0076]. *; | [Y]WO2017175218 (NEXVAP SA [CH]) [Y] 38-39 * ; entire document, especially Fig. 1; Abstract; pg. 19, In 7-19; pg. 19, In 23-30; pg. 22, In 14-18; pg. 22, In 22-33. *; | [A]US2018168231 (REEVELL TONY [GB]) [A] 1-3, 38-45* ; entire document. * | by applicant | US7997280 | CA2851933 | US2013276799 | WO2015079198 | WO2016172802 | US2016331024 | US2018104214 |