EP3846702 - SURGICAL GUIDE AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc. 2500 Silveus Crossing Warsaw, IN 46582 / US | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALL, Daniel Paxton 8531 Farley Avenue Cordova, Tennessee 38016 / US | 02 /
BROWN, Richard Quinn 993 Yorktown Road Collierville, Tennessee 38017 / US | 03 /
GIASER, Adam 7631 Willey Rd Germantown, Tennessee 38138 / US | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 19858159.7 | 28.08.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019US48444 | Priority number, date | US201816124801 | 07.09.2018 Original published format: US201816124801 | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020051029 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3846702 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70, A61B34/30, A61B17/00, A61B90/57, // A61B34/20, A61B17/17 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/1757 (EP,KR,US);
A61B90/11 (EP,US);
A61B17/17 (US);
A61B17/1717 (KR);
A61B17/7082 (EP,KR);
A61B17/7083 (KR);
A61B17/8886 (US);
A61B34/20 (US);
A61B90/57 (EP,US);
A61C1/14 (US);
A61B17/90 (US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/320052 (US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP);
A61B2034/305 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/28] | A61B17/17, A61B17/70, A61B34/30, A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE FÜHRUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2021/28] | English: | SURGICAL GUIDE AND METHODS OF USE | [2021/28] | French: | GUIDE CHIRURGICAL ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2021/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 24.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015202009 (NUSSBAUMER BILLY [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,12-14 * paragraphs [0049] - [0051] - [0060] - [0071]; figures 1,4B,6,7A * [I] 4,5,9,15; | [XAI]US2015223897 (KOSTRZEWSKI SZYMON [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,12-14 * paragraphs [0072] , [0076] , [0083] - [0085]; figures 6-8 * [A] 11 [I] 4,5,9,15; | [A]US2018200016 (CHAPPUIS OLIVIER [CH], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0152] , [0167]; figure 2 * | International search | [A]US8182491 (SELOVER SEAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2015305817 (KOSTRZEWSKI SZYMON [CH]) [A] 1-15 * abstract; paragraphs [0060]-[0063]; figures 1-12C *; | [A]US2016000512 (GOMBERT BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2016087539 (KB MEDICAL SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2017205495 (GLOBUS MEDICAL INC) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2015202009 | US2015223897 | US2018020016 |