EP3780543 - BLOCKCHAIN CROSS-CHAIN AUTHENTICATION METHOD AND SYSTEM, AND SERVER AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced New Technologies Co., Ltd. Cayman Corporate Centre 27 Hospital Road George Town, Grand Cayman KY1-9008 / KY | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Yawen 556 Xixi Road, 8th Floor Section B, Suite 801-11 West Lake District Hangzhou, Zhejiang, China 310000 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Jianjun 556 Xixi Road, 8th Floor Section B, Suite 801-11 West Lake District Hangzhou, Zhejiang, China 310000 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Zhiwei 556 Xixi Road, 8th Floor Section B, Suite 801-11 West Lake District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19858208.2 | 18.07.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019CN96513 | Priority number, date | CN20181128251 | 04.09.2018 Original published format: CN201811028251 | [2021/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020048241 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780543 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L9/32 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
H04L63/126 (EP);
H04L63/08 (EP,CN);
H04L9/3247 (EP,CN,US);
H04L63/06 (EP);
H04L63/0861 (CN);
H04L63/0876 (CN);
H04L9/0643 (CN);
H04L9/0825 (US);
H04L9/0866 (CN);
H04L9/0872 (CN);
H04L9/3231 (EP,US);
H04L9/3236 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR CHAIN-ÜBERGREIFENDEN BLOCKCHAIN-AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG SOWIE SERVER UND LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/07] | English: | BLOCKCHAIN CROSS-CHAIN AUTHENTICATION METHOD AND SYSTEM, AND SERVER AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'AUTHENTIFICATION INTER-CHAÎNES DE CHAÎNES DE BLOCS, ET SERVEUR ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2020 | Translation filed | 28.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 01.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]CA3053316 (COINPLUG INC [KR]) [X] 1-3,14 * abstract * * page 1, line 2 - page 14, line 10 * * page 15, line 20 - page 50, line 6 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 9[I] 4,5 | International search | [A]US2016381001 (LI DEZHI [CN]) [A] 1-25* entire document *; | [A]CN106534160 (JIANGSU TONGFUDUN TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]CN107079036 (CLOUDMINDS (SHENZHEN) ROBOTICS SYSTEMS CO LTD) [A] 1-25 * description, paragraphs [0049]-[0094], and figure 3 *; | [A]CN108064440 (SHENZHEN QIANHAI CLOUDMINDS CLOUD INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [PX]CN109257342 (ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LTD) [PX] 1-25 * claims 1-25, and description, paragraphs [0004]-[0184] * |