EP3848890 - BIOMETRIC AUTHENTICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho 260, Toyota 3-chome Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHASHI, Yosuke c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 260, Toyota 3-chome, Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP | 02 /
OWAKI, Rijin c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 260, Toyota 3-chome, Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP | 03 /
ANDO, Takahiko c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 260, Toyota 3-chome, Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP | 04 /
OHTA, Yasuhisa c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota- cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
GOTO, Yuya c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota- cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 06 /
TAKADA, Naoyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota- cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 07 /
OGAWA, Daisuke c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 260, Toyota 3-chome, Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 19858492.2 | 28.08.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019JP33783 | Priority number, date | JP20180165270 | 04.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018165270 | [2021/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020050115 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848890 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06V40/13, G06V40/12 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
G06V40/1376 (EP,US);
G06F21/32 (US);
A61B5/1172 (EP);
A61B5/6893 (EP);
B60R25/252 (US);
G06V40/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/28] | G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BIOMETRISCHEN AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG | [2021/28] | English: | BIOMETRIC AUTHENTICATION DEVICE | [2021/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AUTHENTIFICATION BIOMÉTRIQUE | [2021/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2021 | Translation filed | 06.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 28.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014294259 (LEE HEON-TAK [KR]) [X] 1-5,8-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0 45] , [0 53] , [0 56] - [0058] - [0097] * [I] 6,7; | [A] - FERNANDO ALONSO-FERNANDEZ ET AL, "A Comparative Study of Fingerprint Image-Quality Estimation Methods", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION FORENSICS AND SECURITY, IEEE, USA, (20071201), vol. 2, no. 4, doi:10.1109/TIFS.2007.908228, ISSN 1556-6013, pages 734 - 743, XP011196791 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIFS.2007.908228 | International search | [Y]JP2000166900 (SONY CORP) [Y] 5-10* , paragraph [0012] (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2002298126 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0002], [0009], [0015], [0018], [0029]-[0030], [0033] (Family: none) * [Y] 2-10; | [Y]JP2017052380 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) [Y] 2-10 * , paragraphs [0065]-[0066], [0071]-[0072] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2008174095 |