Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11239303 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2022 | B2 | US2021074791 | 11.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN92745 | 25.06.2019 | CN201821951977 | 26.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102415286B | Global Dossier | 01.07.2022 | B1 | KR20200118167 | 14.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN92745 | 25.06.2019 | CN201821951977 | 26.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7372931B | Global Dossier | 01.11.2023 | B2 | JP2022509895 | 25.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN92745 | 25.06.2019 | CN201821951977 | 26.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019385925B | Global Dossier | 02.12.2021 | B2 | AU2019385925 | 01.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN92745 | 25.06.2019 | CN201821951977 | 26.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3888075 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2022 | A4 | EP3888075 | 06.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN92745 | 25.06.2019 | CN201821951977 | 26.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112020019332 | 02.01.2024 | B1 | BR112020019332 | 02.02.2021 | A8 | BR112020019332 | 05.01.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN92745 | 25.06.2019 | CN201821951977 | 26.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020010100 | 28.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN92745 | 25.06.2019 | CN201821951977 | 26.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2745003 | 18.03.2021 | C1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN92745 | 25.06.2019 | CN201821951977 | 26.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020107880 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201821951977 | 26.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN208938550U | 04.06.2019 | U | Priority number | Date | CN201821951977 | 26.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI707492B | 11.10.2020 | B | TW202021170 | 01.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201821951977 | 26.11.2018 |