EP3939088 - DISPLAY SUBSTRATE, DISPLAY APPARATUS, METHOD OF FABRICATING DISPLAY SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO., LTD. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Song No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
SHI, Ling No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
ZHANG, Song Beijing 100176 / CN | ||
02 /
SHI, Ling Beijing 100176 / CN | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19858660.4 | 11.03.2019 | [2022/03] | WO2019CN77691 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020181467 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3939088 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, H01L51/52 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
H10K59/122 (EP,US);
H10K50/844 (US);
H10K59/124 (EP,US);
H10K59/131 (EP,US);
H10K71/00 (US);
H10K59/1201 (US);
H10K59/8731 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | ANZEIGESUBSTRAT, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES ANZEIGESUBSTRATS | [2022/03] | English: | DISPLAY SUBSTRATE, DISPLAY APPARATUS, METHOD OF FABRICATING DISPLAY SUBSTRATE | [2022/03] | French: | SUBSTRAT D'AFFICHAGE, APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SUBSTRAT D'AFFICHAGE | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2020 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 20.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015221707 (GO JAE-KYUNG [KR]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0050] , [0051]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2017033312 (KIM DEUKJONG [KR], et al) [Y] 7-12* paragraphs [0008] , [0091] , [0092] , [0099] , [0100] , [0104] - [0111] - [0180] - [0181]; figures 1-3,9-11 *; | [XY]CN108258146 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0032] , [0034] , [0036] , [0037] , [0039] , [0040] , [0045]; figures 2-6 * [Y] 1-14; | [XY]US2018198092 (CHOI YOUNGSEO [KR], et al) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0048] , [0073] , [0093]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 1-4,13,14; | [XY]US2018226483 (KIM DEUKJONG [KR], et al) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0071] - [0076] - [0081] , [0082] , [0083] , [0087] , [0088]; figures 1,2,3,6 * [Y] 1-6,13,14 | International search | [Y]CN104821325 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD) [Y] 4-5 * description, paragraphs [0030]-[0052] and figures 1-3 *; | [Y]CN106409869 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD) [Y] 12-18 * description, paragraphs [0066]-[0150] and figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2017365814 (KIM SANGKI [KR], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [A]CN108091634 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [X]CN108258146 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6-11,19-21 * description, paragraphs [0032]-[0046] and figures 2-9 *; | [Y]CN108258146 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 4-5,12-18 * description, paragraphs [0032]-[0046] and figures 2-9 * | by applicant | US2015221707 | US2017033312 | CN108258146 | US2018198092 | US2018226483 |