Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3881100
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.06.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.06.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
14.06.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
22.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.07.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
13.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.06.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.06.2022 |
First examination report |
|
18.02.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
18.02.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
10.01.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.08.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
20.08.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
20.08.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
15.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
15.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
08.06.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|