EP3849993 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DETECTION OF HPV DNA AND DIAGNOSIS AND MONITORING HPV-ASSOCIATED CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGGINSON, Daniel, Smith Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | 02 /
DAMERLA, Rama, Rao D1701 Royal Embassy Apt Vidyaratna Nagar Manipal, Karnataka 576104 / IN | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19858796.6 | 10.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019US50365 | Priority number, date | US201862729321P | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729321 P | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020055834 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3849993 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/04, C12N15/09, C12N15/11 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q1/708 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (US);
C12Q2600/112 (US);
C12Q2600/118 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR DETEKTION VON HPV-DNA SOWIE DIAGNOSE UND ÜBERWACHUNG VON HPV-ASSOZIIERTEN KARZINOMEN | [2021/29] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DETECTION OF HPV DNA AND DIAGNOSIS AND MONITORING HPV-ASSOCIATED CANCERS | [2021/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LA DÉTECTION D'ADN DE VPH ET LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LA SURVEILLANCE DE CANCERS ASSOCIÉS AU VPH | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 06.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 14.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 14.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.11.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 14.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Loss of rights: Claims | 26.11.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 26.11.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.12.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2016209703 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035]; claims 1-3 * [I] 5,8-11; | [I] - HANNA G.J. ET AL, "Plasma HPV cell-free DNA monitoring in advanced HPV-associated oropharyngeal cancer", ANNALS OF ONCOLOGY, NL, vol. 29, no. 9, doi:10.1093/annonc/mdy251, ISSN 0923-7534, (20180713), pages 1980 - 1986, URL: https://www.annalsofoncology.org/action/showPdf?pii=S0923-7534(19)34172-9, XP055963249 [I] 1,2,4-11 * page 1981, column l, paragraph 3; figure 3; table S1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/annonc/mdy251 | [I] - YANG H. J. ET AL, "Quantification of human papillomavirus DNA in the plasma of patients with cervical cancer", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF GYNECOLOGICAL CANCER, US, (20040801), vol. 14, no. 5, doi:10.1136/ijgc-00009577-200409000-00025, ISSN 1048-891X, pages 903 - 910, XP055955274 [I] 1,2,4-11 * page 904, column r, paragraph l; table 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/ijgc-00009577-200409000-00025 | [I] - WIDSCHWENDTER ANDREAS ET AL, "Human papillomavirus DNA in sera of cervical cancer patients as tumor marker", CANCER LETTERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20031230), vol. 202, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CANLET.2003.09.006, ISSN 0304-3835, pages 231 - 239, XP002488444 [I] 1,2,4-11 * page 233, column r, paragraph l - page 234, column l, paragraph 1; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.canlet.2003.09.006 | [I] - SUN M. AHN ET AL, "Saliva and Plasma Quantitative Polymerase Chain Reaction-Based Detection and Surveillance of Human Papillomavirus-Related Head and Neck Cancer", JAMA OTOLARYNGOLOGY-HEAD & NECK SURGERY, US, (20140901), vol. 140, no. 9, doi:10.1001/jamaoto.2014.1338, ISSN 2168-6181, pages 846 - 854, XP055341074 [I] 1,2,6-11 * page 847, column r, paragraph l; figure 2; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/jamaoto.2014.1338 | [I] - HONGBIN CAO ET AL, "Quantitation of Human Papillomavirus DNA in Plasma of Oropharyngeal Carcinoma Patients", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF RADIATION: ONCOLOGY BIOLOGY PHYSICS, PERGAMON PRESS, USA, vol. 82, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.IJROBP.2011.05.061, ISSN 0360-3016, (20110528), pages e351 - e358, (20110629), XP028453128 [I] 1,2,6-11 * page e353; figures 2-4; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijrobp.2011.05.061 | [XP] - DAMERLA RAMA R. ET AL, "Detection of Early Human Papillomavirus-Associated Cancers by Liquid Biopsy", JCO PRECISION ONCOLOGY, no. 3, doi:10.1200/PO.18.00276, (20190403), pages 1 - 17, URL: https://ascopubs.org/doi/pdfdirect/10.1200/PO.18.00276, XP055955801 [XP] 1,2,4-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/PO.18.00276 | International search | [Y]WO2010125420 (INST NAC DE CANCEROLOGIA [CO], et al) [Y] 1-9, 20-33 * entire document *; | [Y]US2011229876 (DUERKSEN-HUGHES PENELOPE J [US], et al) [Y] 4 * entire document *; | [Y]US9328384 (BELOUSOV YEVGENIY [US]) [Y] 31 * entire document *; | [Y]US2018127839 (CHEN CHI [US], et al) [Y] 20-29, 32, 33 * entire document *; | [Y]US2018171413 (VOGELSTEIN BERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-9, 20-33 * entire document *; | [PA] - DAMERLA et al., "Detection of Early Human Papillomavirus-Associated Cancers by Liquid Biopsy", JCO Precision Oncology, (20190403), vol. 3, no. 2019, pages 1 - 25, XP055704261 [PA] 1-10, 20-34, 38-42 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/PO.18.00276 |