EP3764424 - SEPARATOR FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/02] | SEPARATOR FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | ||
[2024/11] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, A-Young LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Joo-Sung LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
BAE, Won-Sik LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
RYU, Bi-Oh LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19858870.9 | 16.09.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019KR11947 | Priority number, date | KR20180109238 | 12.09.2018 Original published format: KR 20180109238 | [2021/02] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020055218 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764424 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/491, H01M50/449, H01G11/52, H01M10/052, H01M50/417, H01M50/446, H01M50/426, C09D127/16, H01M50/46, H01M50/403, H01M50/443, H01M50/451, H01M50/489, // C08K3/22 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
C09D127/16 (EP,KR);
H01M50/446 (EP,KR,US);
H01G11/52 (EP,KR,US);
C08L27/16 (KR,US);
H01G11/22 (KR,US);
H01G11/84 (KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (KR,US);
H01M4/623 (KR,US);
H01M50/403 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/417 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/426 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/431 (KR);
H01M50/44 (KR,US);
H01M50/443 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/449 (EP,US);
H01M50/451 (EP,KR);
H01M50/461 (EP,KR);
H01M50/489 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/491 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2003/2227 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
C09D127/16, C08K3/22, C08L27/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/20] | H01M50/449, H01G11/52, H01M10/052, H01M50/417, H01M50/446, H01M50/426, H01M50/489, C09D127/16, H01M50/46, // C08K3/22 | ||
Former IPC [2021/02] | H01M2/16, H01M2/14, H01G11/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | SEPARATOR FÜR ELEKTROCHEMISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2021/02] | English: | SEPARATOR FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2024/11] | French: | SÉPARATEUR POUR DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/02] |
Former [2021/02] | SEPARATOR FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2020 | Translation filed | 07.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 26.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016164059 (HONG CHAN [KR], et al); | [A]US2016293922 (UMEYAMA HIROYA [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]KR20120108686 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20160069386 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al); | [Y]KR20170037556 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20170129452 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2018133244 (TEIJIN LTD) | by applicant | KR20180109238 |