EP3849528 - NANOPARTICLE FORMULATIONS AND METHODS OF USE FOR ALPHA CONNEXIN C-TERMINAL PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xequel Bio, Inc. 1501 Belle Isle Ave, Suite 220 Mount Pleasant, SC 29464 / US | [2022/47] |
Former [2021/29] | For all designated states Firststring Research, Inc. 300 West Coleman Blvd. Suite 203 Mount Pleasant, SC 29464 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREK, Christina L. 300 West Coleman Boulevard Suite 203 Mt. Pleasant, South Carolina 29464 / US | 02 /
GHATNEKAR, Gautam S. 300 West Coleman Boulevard Suite 203 Mt. Pleasant, South Carolina 29464 / US | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19859215.6 | 12.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019US50822 | Priority number, date | US201862730116P | 12.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862730116 P | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020056144 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3849528 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/51, A61K38/00, B82Y5/00, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, A61K9/00, A61K31/175, A61K31/196, A61K31/198, A61K31/255, A61K31/495, A61K31/519, A61K31/675, A61K31/704, A61K33/243, A61K38/06, A61K38/17, A61K38/45, A61P17/02, A61P35/00, A61K31/7048 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K38/45 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K9/5153 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K38/177 (IL,US);
A61K31/17 (IL,US);
A61K31/175 (EP,IL);
A61K31/196 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,IL);
A61K31/255 (EP,IL);
A61K31/282 (IL,US);
A61K31/337 (IL,US);
A61K31/475 (IL,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,IL);
A61K31/675 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,IL);
A61K33/243 (EP,IL);
A61K38/063 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K38/08 (IL,KR);
A61K38/14 (IL,US);
A61K38/164 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K38/168 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K38/1709 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K38/50 (IL,US);
A61K45/06 (IL,KR);
A61K47/02 (IL,US);
A61K47/26 (IL,KR);
A61K9/0014 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/1635 (IL,US);
A61K9/1647 (IL,US);
A61K9/1694 (IL,US);
A61K9/19 (IL,KR);
A61K9/5138 (IL,KR);
A61P17/02 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/175, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/196, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/255, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/495, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/675, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7048, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/704, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/243, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/063, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/164, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/168, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/1709, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/29] | A61K9/51, A61K38/00, B82Y5/00, C07K7/06, C07K7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | NANOPARTIKELFORMULIERUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ALPHA-CONNEXIN-C-TERMINALE PEPTIDE | [2021/29] | English: | NANOPARTICLE FORMULATIONS AND METHODS OF USE FOR ALPHA CONNEXIN C-TERMINAL PEPTIDES | [2021/29] | French: | FORMULATIONS DE NANOPARTICULES ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION DE PEPTIDES À TERMINAISON C DE CONNEXINE ALPHA | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 11.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/25] | 14.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006069181 (MUSC FOUND FOR RES DEV [US], et al); | [X]AU2012202117 (MUSC FOUND FOR RES DEV); | [X]WO2013131040 (FIRSTSTRING RES INC [US]); | [X]US2016120171 (GHATNEKAR GAUTAM [US], et al); | [X]WO2018151823 (FIRSTSTRING RES INC [US]) | International search | [A]WO2013073968 (IND RES LTD [NZ], et al); | [X]US2014038880 (GHATNEKAR GAUTAM [US]); | [X]US2015018284 (GHATNEKAR GAUTAM [US]); | [A]US2016166637 (GOURDIE ROBERT G [US], et al); | [A]US2016177298 (GREEN COLIN RICHARD [NZ], et al); | [A]US2018028468 (BECKER DAVID L [GB], et al) |