EP3851337 - AIRBAG DOOR HINGE, TRIM FOR AUTOMOBILE INTERIOR COMPRISING SAME, AND TRIM MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Yanfeng Jinqiao Automotive Trim Systems Co., Ltd. 2166 Jufeng Road China (Shanghai) Pilot Free Trade Zone Pudong New Area Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOU, Jianfeng 1001 North Qinzhou Road Shanghai 200233 / CN | 02 /
CUI, Feng 1001 North Qinzhou Road Shanghai 200233 / CN | 03 /
DAI, Xinye 1001 North Qinzhou Road Shanghai 200233 / CN | 04 /
HUAN, Dong 1001 North Qinzhou Road Shanghai 200233 / CN | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19859386.5 | 16.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019CN105927 | Priority number, date | CN201821507407U | 14.09.2018 Original published format: CN 201821507407 U | [2021/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020052684 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3851337 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/215, E05D1/00, E05D9/00 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
B60R21/215 (EP);
B60R2021/21537 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | AIRBAG-TÜRSCHARNIER, VERKLEIDUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGINNENRAUM DAMIT UND VERKLEIDUNGSHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/29] | English: | AIRBAG DOOR HINGE, TRIM FOR AUTOMOBILE INTERIOR COMPRISING SAME, AND TRIM MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2021/29] | French: | CHARNIÈRE DE PORTE À COUSSIN DE SÉCURITÉ GONFLABLE, GARNITURE POUR INTÉRIEUR DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE COMPRENANT CELLE-CI ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE GARNITURE | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2021 | Translation filed | 11.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 20.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102012220979 (DRAEXLMAIER LISA GMBH [DE]); | [X]DE102013017382 (DRAEXLMAIER LISA GMBH [DE]); | [X]DE102015104715 (DRAEXLMAIER LISA GMBH [DE]) |