Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022039431 | Global Dossier | 10.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2018903408 | 11.09.2018 | WO2019AU00107 | 11.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112702921 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | AU2018903408 | 11.09.2018 | WO2019AU00107 | 11.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3219007 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2018903408 | 11.09.2018 | CA3112127 | 11.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3112127 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2024 | C | CA3112127 | 19.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2018903408 | 11.09.2018 | WO2019AU00107 | 11.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2023201174 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2019339916 | 11.09.2019 | AU2018903408 | 11.09.2018 | WO2019AU00107 | 11.09.2019 | AU2023201174 | 27.02.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019339916 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2018903408 | 11.09.2018 | WO2019AU00107 | 11.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3849331 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2022 | A4 | EP3849331 | 21.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2018903408 | 11.09.2018 | WO2019AU00107 | 11.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021004531 | 08.06.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | AU2018903408 | 11.09.2018 | WO2019AU00107 | 11.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021002759 | 14.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | AU2018903408 | 11.09.2018 | WO2019AU00107 | 11.09.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020051622 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2018903408 | 11.09.2018 |