EP3849331 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EXTRACTING A PROTEIN FOOD PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Australian Plant Proteins Pty. Ltd. Level 27, 101 Collins Street Melbourne, Victoria 3000 / AU | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McFARLANE, Phillip 50 Bridge Street Hampton, Victoria 3188 / AU | 02 /
McKEEGAN, Brendan 2A Bell Boulevard Jan Juc, Victoria 3228 / AU | 03 /
LINGHAM, Christa 119 Linghams Road Rupanyup, Victoria 3388 / AU | 04 /
LINGHAM, Rod 119 Linghams Road Rupanyup, Victoria 3388 / AU | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 19859536.5 | 11.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019AU00107 | Priority number, date | AU20180903408 | 11.09.2018 Original published format: AU 2018903408 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020051622 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3849331 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/14, A23L33/185, A23L11/00, A23L2/39, B01D61/14, A23P10/40, A23L2/66 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
A23L2/39 (EP,AU,US);
A23J1/14 (EP,AU,US);
A23L11/05 (EP,AU,US);
A23L2/66 (EP,US);
A23L33/185 (EP,AU,US);
A23P10/40 (EP,AU,US);
B01D61/145 (EP);
B01D61/146 (EP,AU,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP);
B01D2317/022 (EP);
B01D2317/08 (EP);
B01D2319/022 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/33, A23V2250/548 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | A23J1/14, A23L33/185, A23L11/00, A23L2/39 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR EXTRAKTION EINES PROTEINNAHRUNGSMITTELS | [2021/29] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EXTRACTING A PROTEIN FOOD PRODUCT | [2021/29] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRACTION D'UN PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE PROTÉINÉ | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 11.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 02.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.03.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4285862 (MURRAY E DONALD, et al); | [XYI]US4420425 (LAWHON JAMES T [US]); | [XYI]US6284292 (NIELSEN PER MUNK [DK], et al); | [XI]US2003211225 (SINGH NAVPREET [US]); | [XYI]US2016050956 (SEGALL KEVIN I [CA], et al); | [XI]WO2018011786 (YISSUM RES DEV CO OF HEBREW UNIV JERUSALEM LTD [IL]); | International search | [X]US4420425 (LAWHON JAMES T [US]); | [X]US4677065 (BUECHBJERG ERNST [DK], et al); | [X]US6284292 (NIELSEN PER MUNK [DK], et al); | [X]US2003211225 (SINGH NAVPREET [US]); | [X]US2016050956 (SEGALL KEVIN I [CA], et al); | by applicant | US4285862 |